This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/23/2022 at 07:48:51 (UTC).

BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC et al v. GLAND PHARMA LIMITED

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against GLAND PHARMA LIMITED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Hammer, Claire C. Cecchi and Leda D. Wettre. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00939

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

Referral Judges

Michael A. Hammer

Leda D. Wettre

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC

SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

WYETH LLC

Defendant

GLAND PHARMA LIMITED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.

Attorney at GIBBONS, PC

One Gateway Center

Newark, NJ 07102-5310

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to GLAND PHARMA LIMITED. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (wh) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

5 #10

Certification

5 #9

Exhibit H

5 #8

Exhibit G

5 #7

Exhibit F

5 #6

Exhibit E

5 #5

Exhibit D

5 #4

Exhibit C

5 #3

Exhibit B

5 #2

Exhibit A

5 #1

Complaint

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WYETH LLC identifying Pfizer Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (DENI, WILLIAM) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. identifying Lantheus Medical Imaging, Inc., which itself is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Lantheus Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (DENI, WILLIAM) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC, SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (DENI, WILLIAM) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Main Document

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte no longer assigned to the case. (mfr) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer no longer assigned to the case. (mxw, ) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER: Counsel shall mail a tabbed copy of the complaint to Chambers by 3/11/2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/24/2022. (jqb, ) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to GLAND PHARMA LIMITED. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (wh) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AO120 Patent Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Certification) (wh) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WYETH LLC identifying Pfizer Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (DENI, WILLIAM) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. identifying Lantheus Medical Imaging, Inc., which itself is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Lantheus Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (DENI, WILLIAM) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC, SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (DENI, WILLIAM) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against GLAND PHARMA LIMITED ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13204280) , Related Case Selected, filed by WYETH LLC, BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC, PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 L. Civ. R. 11.2 Certification)(DENI, WILLIAM) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLAND PHARMA LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where Progenics Pharmaceuticals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WYETH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bausch Health Companies Incorporated is a litigant