This case was last updated from PACER on 01/07/2020 at 05:19:53 (UTC).

Baugus v. National Collegiate Athletic Association

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Baugus filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against National Collegiate Athletic Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00091

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marvin Baugus, II

Defendant

National Collegiate Athletic Association

Po Box 6222

Indianapolis, IN 46206

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey Lewis Raizner

Attorney at Raizner Slania, Llp

2402 Dunlavy Street

Houston, TX 77006

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, filed by MARVIN BAUGUS, II. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5737417) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Raizner, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 11/22/2019)

8 #1

*Restricted*

#8

(#8) RECEIVED from Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-04654 (las) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#5

(#5) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 11/25/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#9

(#9) E-MAILED Rule 83.15 to counsel of record (las, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Raizner on behalf of Plaintiff MARVIN BAUGUS, II. (Raizner, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 11/22/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#6

(#6) CLOSED TRANSFER to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois IN RE: MDL 2492 IN RE: National Collegiate Athletic Association Student-Athlete Concussion Injury Litigation Certified Transfer Order # 25. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. (AKH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#10

(#10) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: IT APPEARING THAT case number 20cv91 was opened and assigned in error, therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the assignment of 20cv91 shall be vacated and that case number 20cv91 shall not be used for any other proceeding. Case reassigned to the Unassigned for all further proceedings. Honorable John Z. Lee no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/6/2020. (td, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#7

(#7) Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Illinois. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Illinois, IN RE: MDL 2492 on January 3, 2020. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 01/06/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: IT APPEARING THAT case number 20cv91 was opened and assigned in error, therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the assignment of 20cv91 shall be vacated and that case number 20cv91 shall not be used for any other proceeding. Case reassigned to the Unassigned for all further proceedings. Honorable John Z. Lee no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/6/2020. (td, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) E-MAILED Rule 83.15 to counsel of record (las, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RECEIVED from Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-04654 (las) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Illinois. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Illinois, IN RE: MDL 2492 on January 3, 2020. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CLOSED TRANSFER to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois IN RE: MDL 2492 IN RE: National Collegiate Athletic Association Student-Athlete Concussion Injury Litigation Certified Transfer Order # 25. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. (AKH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Raizner on behalf of Plaintiff MARVIN BAUGUS, II. (Raizner, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, filed by MARVIN BAUGUS, II. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5737417) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Raizner, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.