This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2019 at 07:12:40 (UTC).

Baughman, Jr. v. Lowe's Home Improvement Store

Case Summary

On 05/21/2019 Baughman, Jr filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Lowe's Home Improvement Store. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr and Stephen R Clark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-01398

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr

Stephen R Clark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patrick Owen Baughman, Jr.

Bonne Terre, MO 63628

Defendant

Lowe's Home Improvement Store

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Jeremy Keith Schrag

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard Smith LLP

1605 N. Waterfront Parkway, Suite 150

Wichita, KS 67206

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Patrick Owen Baughman, Jr. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel (#4) is DENIED without prejudice at this time. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/30/19. (CSG) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#13

(#13) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court, City of St. Louis filed by Defendant Lowe's Home Improvement Store. (Schrag, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Lowe's Home Improvement Store.(Schrag, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court, City of St. Louis by Defendant Lowe's Home Improvement Store. (Schrag, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Patrick Owen Baughman, Jr.. (BAK) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Lowe's Home Improvement Store Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Filed Notice of Removal with Exhibits)(Schrag, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

1 #3

Original Filing Form

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Lowe's Home Improvement Store Sent To: State Court - Executed (Schrag, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

2 #1

Filed Notice of Removal with Exhibits

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Lowe's Home Improvement Store. Parent companies: Lowe's Cos. Inc.,. (Schrag, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Patrick Owen Baughman, Jr..(BAK) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#12

(#12) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases shall be transferred to the Honorable Stephen R. Clark, U.S. District Judge. All deadlines previously set remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/10/19. (JAB) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

1 #1

State Court Records

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of City of St. Louis, Missouri, case number 1922-CC00682, with receipt number 0865-7225748, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Lowe's Home Improvement Store. (Attachments: #1 State Court Records, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Schrag, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court, City of St. Louis by Plaintiff Patrick Owen Baughman, Jr.. (MRS) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court, City of St. Louis filed by Defendant Lowe's Home Improvement Store. (Schrag, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 12. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification Wed Jul 10 15:02:01 CDT 2019 (Bernsen, John) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases shall be transferred to the Honorable Stephen R. Clark, U.S. District Judge. All deadlines previously set remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/10/19. (JAB) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 11. Mon Jul 8 14:53:32 CDT 2019 (Schaefer, Michelle) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court, City of St. Louis by Defendant Lowe's Home Improvement Store. (Schrag, Jeremy) filed by Lowe's Home Improvement Store ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/8/19. (MRS) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court, City of St. Louis by Defendant Lowe's Home Improvement Store. (Schrag, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court, City of St. Louis by Plaintiff Patrick Owen Baughman, Jr.. (MRS) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 8. Thu May 30 13:42:53 CDT 2019 (Gould, Cathy) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Patrick Owen Baughman, Jr. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel (#4) is DENIED without prejudice at this time. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/30/19. (CSG) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Lowe's Home Improvement Store.(Schrag, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Lowe's Home Improvement Store. Parent companies: Lowe's Cos. Inc.,. (Schrag, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Lowe's Home Improvement Store Sent To: State Court - Executed (Schrag, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (BAK) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Patrick Owen Baughman, Jr.. (BAK) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Patrick Owen Baughman, Jr..(BAK) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Lowe's Home Improvement Store Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Filed Notice of Removal with Exhibits)(Schrag, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of City of St. Louis, Missouri, case number 1922-CC00682, with receipt number 0865-7225748, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Lowe's Home Improvement Store. (Attachments: #1 State Court Records, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Schrag, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.