This case was last updated from PACER on 01/26/2020 at 07:57:18 (UTC).

Baugh v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 Baugh filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert L Miller, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00506

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert L Miller, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kearen L. Baugh

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Not Classified By Court

SSA (Court Use Only)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen M Sloan

Attorney at Daley Disability Law PC

4256 N Ravenswood Ave Ste 104

Chicago, IL 60613

Frederick J Daley, Jr

Attorney at Daley Disability Law PC

4256 N Ravenswood Ave Ste 104

Chicago, IL 60613

 

Court Documents

#7

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court DEFERS payment of the filing fee, ORDERS the plaintiff to pay the $350.00 filing fee from the proceeds of any recovery received in this case and DIRECTS the United States Marshals Service to serve process upon the defendant. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/13/19. (Copy to USM). (nal) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kearen L. Baugh. Commissioner of Social Security served on 12/26/2019, U.S. Attorney General served on 12/262019, and U.S. Attorney served 12/27/2019 and answer due 2/25/2020. (mrm) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (Copy to USM). (nal) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court DEFERS payment of the filing fee, ORDERS the plaintiff to pay the $350.00 filing fee from the proceeds of any recovery received in this case and DIRECTS the United States Marshals Service to serve process upon the defendant. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/13/19. (Copy to USM). (nal) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • Judge Robert L Miller, Jr added. *NEW CASE* (lhc) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M Sloan on behalf of Kearen L. Baugh (Sloan, Stephen) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick J Daley, Jr on behalf of Kearen L. Baugh (Daley, Frederick) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kearen L. Baugh. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 (Commissioner), #2 USM-285 (Attorney General), #3 USM-285 (U.S. Attorney))(Daley, Frederick) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Kearen L. Baugh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Daley, Frederick) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.