This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2020 at 09:21:16 (UTC).

BATTLE v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 BATTLE filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03441

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BERNARD BATTLE

Leavenworth, KS 66048-2222

Respondent

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: TRANSFER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Petitioners response to this order (not to exceed five pages) will be due by September 23. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2019.] (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#13

(#13) Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to BERNARD BATTLE; Type of Document Returned: ORDER (adh, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#12

(#12) Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to BERNARD BATTLE; Type of Document Returned: ORDER (adh, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Change of Address by BERNARD BATTLE (zsb) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDERED that within thirty (30) days from the filing date of this order, petitioner shall either submit the $5 statutory filing fee, or in the alternative, submit a sworn application to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") pursuant to U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). The court has attached a template IFP application form to this order for convenience. Because petitioner has filed a habeas matter, he need not submit a trust fund account statement. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/26/19. (zmd) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

10 #1

*Restricted*

#10

(#10) Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-07206. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OFCOLUMBIA by Judge Dolly M. Gee. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. (See Order for further details) Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (vm) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2019.] (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#8

(#8) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: COPY OF DOCKET by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Petitioners request for a copy of the docket in this habeas action is granted. (Docket # 7.) The Clerk will mail a copy to him promptly. The clerk mailed a copy of the docket to Petitioner. (See Minute Order for further details) re: REQUEST to for copy of docket sheet #7 . (vm) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2019.] (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#7

(#7) REQUEST to for copy of docket sheet filed by petitioner Bernard Battle. (vm) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2019.] (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#6

(#6) NON-OPPOSITION regarding Transfer filed by Petitioner Bernard Battle. re Order to Show Cause #3 (vm) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2019.] (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#5

(#5) Letter from petitioner Bernard Battle. (vm) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2019.] (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#4

(#4) RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause filed by Petitioner Bernard Battle. #3 (vm) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2019.] (Entered: 09/05/2019)

2 #2

IFP Form

2 #1

CV111 Notice Re Discrepancies in Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV111 Notice Re Discrepancies in Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition, #2 IFP Form) (car) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2019.] (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). Case assigned to Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R Wilner.(Filing fee $ 5 FEE DUE), filed by Petitioner Bernard Battle. (car) Modified on 8/26/2019 (jtil). [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2019.] (Entered: 08/22/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to BERNARD BATTLE; Type of Document Returned: ORDER (adh, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to BERNARD BATTLE; Type of Document Returned: ORDER (adh, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Change of Address by BERNARD BATTLE (zsb) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDERED that within thirty (30) days from the filing date of this order, petitioner shall either submit the $5 statutory filing fee, or in the alternative, submit a sworn application to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") pursuant to U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). The court has attached a template IFP application form to this order for convenience. Because petitioner has filed a habeas matter, he need not submit a trust fund account statement. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/26/19. (zmd) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-07206. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OFCOLUMBIA by Judge Dolly M. Gee. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. (See Order for further details) Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (vm) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2019.] (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: COPY OF DOCKET by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Petitioners request for a copy of the docket in this habeas action is granted. (Docket # 7.) The Clerk will mail a copy to him promptly. The clerk mailed a copy of the docket to Petitioner. (See Minute Order for further details) re: REQUEST to for copy of docket sheet #7 . (vm) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2019.] (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REQUEST to for copy of docket sheet filed by petitioner Bernard Battle. (vm) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2019.] (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NON-OPPOSITION regarding Transfer filed by Petitioner Bernard Battle. re Order to Show Cause #3 (vm) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2019.] (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter from petitioner Bernard Battle. (vm) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2019.] (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause filed by Petitioner Bernard Battle. #3 (vm) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2019.] (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: TRANSFER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Petitioners response to this order (not to exceed five pages) will be due by September 23. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2019.] (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV111 Notice Re Discrepancies in Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition, #2 IFP Form) (car) [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2019.] (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). Case assigned to Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R Wilner.(Filing fee $ 5 FEE DUE), filed by Petitioner Bernard Battle. (car) Modified on 8/26/2019 (jtil). [Transferred from California Central on 11/15/2019.] (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less