This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/02/2022 at 05:51:59 (UTC).

BATTISTA v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 BATTISTA filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise L. Cote. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-10210

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise L. Cote

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Colleen Battista

Defendants

Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.

McNeil-PPC Inc.

McNeil Consumer Healthcare

Target Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARD M. GOLOMB

Attorney at Golomb Spirt Grunfeld, P.C.

1835 Market Street, Suite 2900

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorney

CHANDA A MILLER

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

100 N 18Th Street, Suite 415

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Designation Form

1 #4

Exhibit 1

1 #5

Exhibit 2

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC..(MILLER, CHANDA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/1/2022.] (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 11/16/2022. 11/16/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/1/2022.] (Entered: 11/16/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Memorandum In Support of Motion to Stay

5 #2

Text of Proposed Order

5 #3

Exhibit A

5 #4

Exhibit B

5 #5

Exhibit C

#6

(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-7) THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK FOR COORIDINATED OR CONSOLIDATED PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. & 1407; ETC. (JL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/1/2022.] (Entered: 11/29/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketNOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (vba) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vba) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vba) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-md-03043-DLC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:22-md-03043-DLC. (vba) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number: 2:22-cv-04547. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketTHE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (JL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/1/2022.] (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-7) THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK FOR COORIDINATED OR CONSOLIDATED PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. & 1407; ETC. (JL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/1/2022.] (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Stay filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Stay, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(MILLER, CHANDA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/1/2022.] (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • Docket(#4) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA COUNTY. (rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/1/2022.] (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 11/16/2022. 11/16/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/1/2022.] (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC..(MILLER, CHANDA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/1/2022.] (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia, case number 221101178., filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2). (Receipt Number #APAEDC-16310310, Filing Fee $402). (MILLER, CHANDA) Modified on 11/14/2022 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/1/2022.] (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where McNeil Consumer Healthcare is a litigant

Latest cases where JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant