This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/13/2023 at 08:52:53 (UTC).

BATTISTA v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 BATTISTA filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is PAUL S. DIAMOND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-04547

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PAUL S. DIAMOND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLLEEN BATTISTA

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.

MCNEIL-PPC, INC.

MCNEIL CONSUMER HEALTHCARE

TARGET CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARD M. GOLOMB

Attorney at Golomb Spirt Grunfeld, P.C.

1835 Market Street, Suite 2900

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorney

CHANDA A MILLER

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

100 N 18Th Street, Suite 415

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Designation Form

1 #4

Exhibit 1

1 #5

Exhibit 2

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC..(MILLER, CHANDA) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 11/16/2022. 11/16/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Memorandum In Support of Motion to Stay

5 #2

Text of Proposed Order

5 #3

Exhibit A

5 #4

Exhibit B

5 #5

Exhibit C

#6

(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-7) THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK FOR COORIDINATED OR CONSOLIDATED PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. & 1407; ETC. (JL) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketTHE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (JL) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-7) THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK FOR COORIDINATED OR CONSOLIDATED PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. & 1407; ETC. (JL) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Stay filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Stay, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(MILLER, CHANDA) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • Docket(#4) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA COUNTY. (rf, ) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 11/16/2022. 11/16/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC..(MILLER, CHANDA) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia, case number 221101178., filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2). (Receipt Number #APAEDC-16310310, Filing Fee $402). (MILLER, CHANDA) Modified on 11/14/2022 (fb). (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where McNeil Consumer Healthcare is a litigant

Latest cases where JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant