This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2021 at 07:14:45 (UTC).

Battery Conservation Innovations, LLC v. Corsair Gaming, Inc.

Case Summary

On September 20, 2021, Battery Conservation Innovations, Inc. (“Plaintiff” or “BCI”), represented by Stephen Michael Lobbin of SML Avvocati P.C., filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Corsair Gaming, Inc. (“Defendant” or “Corsair”), seeking injunctive relief along with damages for the alleged infringement of United States Patent owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the Northern District of California.

 

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of United States Patent No. 9,239,158 (hereinafter the “`158 Patent”) entitled “Battery-Conserving Flashlight and Method Thereof” owned by the Plaintiff.

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Defendant has knowledge of its infringement of the `158 Patent, at least as of the service of the present complaint. Upon information and belief, Defendant has infringed and continues to infringe one or more claims, including at least Claim 15, of the ‘158 Patent by making, using, importing, selling, and/or offering for sale battery conserving electronic devices covered by one or more claims of the ‘158 Patent. Defendant sells, offers to sell, and/or uses battery conserving electronic devices, including, without limitation, the DARK Core RGB PRO SE wireless gaming mouse, and any similar products (“Product”), which infringe at least Claim 15 of the ‘158 Patent.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “The Product is a battery-conserving electronic device. For example, the Product is powered by a battery and includes motion sensing capabilities, wherein the Product may automatically switch to sleep mode when no movement is detected. The Product includes a body with an opening for accessing an interior of the body. The Product has at least one replaceable battery disposed in the body and configured for powering the device. The Product has a visual indicator (e.g., LED status indicator) disposed on an exterior surface of the body. Defendant’s actions complained of herein are causing irreparable harm and monetary damage to Plaintiff and will continue to do so.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Defendant has committed these acts of literal infringement, or infringement under the doctrine of equivalents of the `158 Patent, without license or authorization. As a result of Defendant’s infringement of the `158 Patent, Plaintiff has suffered monetary damages. Plaintiff is entitled to compensation for any continuing and/or future infringement of the `158 Patent up until the date that Defendant ceases its infringing activities.”

 

There is only one claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff, for the alleged infringement of United States Patent No. 9,239,158 owned by the Plaintiff.

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the Court to enter an order enjoining the Defendant, its agents, officers, servants, employees, attorneys, and all persons in active concert or participation with the Defendant who receives notice of the order from further infringement of United States Patent No. 9,239,158 (or, in the alternative, awarding the Plaintiff running royalty from the time judgment going forward). The Plaintiff also requested the Court to award damages resulting from the Defendant’s infringement in accordance with 35 U.S.C. § 284 along with such further relief to which the Court finds the Plaintiff entitled under law or equity.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.



Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-07322

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BATTERY CONSERVATION INNOVATIONS, LLC

Defendant

Corsair Gaming, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen Michael Lobbin

Attorney at SML Avvocati P.C.

888 Prospect Street, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92037

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION re #8 Summons Returned Executed filed by Battery Conservation Innovations, LLC. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 10/20/2021) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER RE: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Motions terminated: #13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Summons Returned Executed filed by Battery Conservation Innovations, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 19, 2021. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2021) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Summons Returned Executed filed by Battery Conservation Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 10/18/2021) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/4/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/11/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanc ed notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than January 10, 2022 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 1/4/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/11/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/04/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2021) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Battery Conservation Innovations, LLC.. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 9/28/2021) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Battery Conservation Innovations, LLC. Corsair Gaming, Inc. served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 9/24/2021) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/16/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/23/2021 11:00 AM. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2021) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Corsair Gaming, Inc.. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2021) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/5/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2021) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BATTERY CONSERVATION INNOVATIONS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management LLC for BATTERY CONSERVATION INNOVATIONS, LLC. re #1 Complaint, (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 9/20/2021) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 9/20/2021) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 9/20/2021) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand for Patent Infringement against Corsair Gaming, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16409944.) filed by BATTERY CONSERVATION INNOVATIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 9/20/2021) Modified on 9/21/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Battery Conservation Innovations, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen M. Lobbin