This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/27/2023 at 09:28:23 (UTC).

Battaglio et al v. Ford Motor Company

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 Battaglio filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Janis van Meerveld and Greg Gerard Guidry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00681

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Janis van Meerveld

Presiding Judge

Greg Gerard Guidry

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Scott Battaglio

Stephanie Battaglio

Defendant

Ford Motor Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Collins Dalton

Defendant Attorneys

Robert W. Maxwell

Carl Joseph Giffin, Jr.

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Ford Motor Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9812905) filed by Scott Battaglio, Stephanie Battaglio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Richard Collins Dalton added to party Scott Battaglio(pty:pla), Attorney Richard Collins Dalton added to party Stephanie Battaglio(pty:pla).(Dalton, Richard) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. (ko) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Lance M Africk recused. Case reassigned to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 02/27/2023. (NEF: Section T)(ko) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

#5

(#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Robert W. Maxwell added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft).(Maxwell, Robert) Modified text/link on 3/30/2023 (js). (Entered: 03/30/2023)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint, as to Ford Motor Company answer due 4/19/2023. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 3/31/2023. (mmm) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company.(Maxwell, Robert) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

#9

(#9) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Ford Motor Company. (Maxwell, Robert) Modified text on 4/12/2023 (js). (Entered: 04/11/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 5/3/2023 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(dp) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

#11

(#11) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record Carl J Giffin Jr. by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Maxwell, Robert) Modified text on 4/26/2023 (js). (Entered: 04/26/2023)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record; Attorney Carl Joseph Giffin, Jr for Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 05/01/2023. (js) (Entered: 05/01/2023)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/2/2023 10:00 AM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Jury Trial set for 11/27/2023 09:30 AM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry (3 days). All discovery must be completed by 9/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(dp) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record; Attorney Carl Joseph Giffin, Jr for Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 05/01/2023. (js) (Entered: 05/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record Carl J Giffin Jr. by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Maxwell, Robert) Modified text on 4/26/2023 (js). (Entered: 04/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 5/3/2023 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(dp) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Ford Motor Company. (Maxwell, Robert) Modified text on 4/12/2023 (js). (Entered: 04/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company.(Maxwell, Robert) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint, as to Ford Motor Company answer due 4/19/2023. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 3/31/2023. (mmm) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. Document contains incorrect Section Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section T, Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. (js) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Robert W. Maxwell added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft).(Maxwell, Robert) Modified text/link on 3/30/2023 (js). (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Lance M Africk recused. Case reassigned to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 02/27/2023. (NEF: Section T)(ko) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. (ko) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (mb) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Ford Motor Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9812905) filed by Scott Battaglio, Stephanie Battaglio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Richard Collins Dalton added to party Scott Battaglio(pty:pla), Attorney Richard Collins Dalton added to party Stephanie Battaglio(pty:pla).(Dalton, Richard) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less