This case was last updated from PACER on 01/01/2021 at 08:43:08 (UTC).

In re: Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc. as Owner Pro Hac Vice of the M/V Flicker

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 In re Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc as Owner Pro Hac Vice of the M/V Flicker was filed as a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr and Brian A. Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00742

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

Presiding Judge

Brian A. Jackson

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc.

Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc. as Owner Pro Hac Vice of the M/V Flicker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Zoe Wilde Vermeulen

Attorney at Kean Miller LLP

909 Poydras Street, Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70112

Lauren Alana Guichard

Attorney at Kean Miller, LLP

909 Poydras Street, Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70112

Bradley Joseph Schlotterer

Attorney at Kean Miller LLP

909 Poydras Street, Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70112

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability. (EDC) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #4 Ex Parte MOTION For Order Approving Security, Directing Issuance of Notice, and Restraining Prosecution of Claims as stated herein. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/17/2020. (EDC) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #3 Ex Parte MOTION For Approval of Stipulation of Value and Ad Interim Stipulation for Value. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/17/2020. (EDC) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

4 #3

Attachment Order Approving Limitation Petitioner's Security, Directing Issu

4 #2

Attachment Notice to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration From or Limitation o

4 #1

Memorandum in Support

#4

(#4) Ex Parte MOTION For Order Approving Security, Directing Issuance of Notice, and Restraining Prosecution of Claims by Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc. as Owner Pro Hac Vice of the M/V Flicker. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Notice to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability, #3 Attachment Order Approving Limitation Petitioner's Security, Directing Issuance of Notice to Claimants and Restraining Prosecution of Claims)(Guichard, Lauren) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

3 #1

Attachment Proposed Order

#3

(#3) Ex Parte MOTION For Approval of Stipulation of Value and Ad Interim Stipulation for Value by Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc. as Owner Pro Hac Vice of the M/V Flicker. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Guichard, Lauren) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Security and Ad Interim Stipulation for Value Under Rule F and Other Supplemental Rules of Certain Admiralty and Maritime Claims by Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc. as Owner Pro Hac Vice of the M/V Flicker (Attachments: #1 Attachment Letter of Undertaking)(Guichard, Lauren) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

1 #5

Attachment Notice to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration From or Limitation o

1 #4

Attachment Proposed Order Approving Limitation Petitioner's Security, Direc

1 #2

Exhibit B Letter of Undertaking

#1

(#1) Verified Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2195776.), filed by Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Affidavit of Value, #2 Exhibit B Letter of Undertaking, #3 Exhibit C List of Potential Claimants, #4 Attachment Proposed Order Approving Limitation Petitioner's Security, Directing Issuance of Notice to Claimants and Restraining Prosecution of Claims, #5 Attachment Notice to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability, #6 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Vermeulen, Zoe) Modified on 11/3/2020 to edit text. (EDC). (Entered: 11/02/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability. (EDC) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #4 Ex Parte MOTION For Order Approving Security, Directing Issuance of Notice, and Restraining Prosecution of Claims as stated herein. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/17/2020. (EDC) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #3 Ex Parte MOTION For Approval of Stipulation of Value and Ad Interim Stipulation for Value. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/17/2020. (EDC) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Ex Parte MOTION For Order Approving Security, Directing Issuance of Notice, and Restraining Prosecution of Claims by Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc. as Owner Pro Hac Vice of the M/V Flicker. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Notice to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability, #3 Attachment Order Approving Limitation Petitioner's Security, Directing Issuance of Notice to Claimants and Restraining Prosecution of Claims)(Guichard, Lauren) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Ex Parte MOTION For Approval of Stipulation of Value and Ad Interim Stipulation for Value by Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc. as Owner Pro Hac Vice of the M/V Flicker. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Guichard, Lauren) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Security and Ad Interim Stipulation for Value Under Rule F and Other Supplemental Rules of Certain Admiralty and Maritime Claims by Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc. as Owner Pro Hac Vice of the M/V Flicker (Attachments: #1 Attachment Letter of Undertaking)(Guichard, Lauren) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Payment of $250.00 Bond by Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc.. Filing fee $ 250, receipt number ALAMDC-2195960. (Vermeulen, Zoe) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Verified Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2195776.), filed by Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Affidavit of Value, #2 Exhibit B Letter of Undertaking, #3 Exhibit C List of Potential Claimants, #4 Attachment Proposed Order Approving Limitation Petitioner's Security, Directing Issuance of Notice to Claimants and Restraining Prosecution of Claims, #5 Attachment Notice to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability, #6 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Vermeulen, Zoe) Modified on 11/3/2020 to edit text. (EDC). (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren A. Guichard