This case was last updated from PACER on 07/21/2019 at 07:51:05 (UTC).

Batiste et al v. U S Dept of Veterans Affairs et al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2019 Batiste filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against U S Dept of Veterans Affairs. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patrick J Hanna and Robert R Summerhays. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00654

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patrick J Hanna

Presiding Judge

Robert R Summerhays

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ambrey Batiste

Bradford Calais

Annette Batiste

Defendants

U S Dept of Veterans Affairs

Megan Cobb

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lawrence B Jones

Attorney at Blake Jones Law Firm (NO)

701 Poydras St Ste 4100

New Orleans, LA 70139

Lawrence Joseph Centola, Jr

Attorney at Blake Jones Law Firm (NO)

701 Poydras St Ste 4100

New Orleans, LA 70139

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, U S Dept of Veterans Affairs, Megan Cobb (crt,JonesSld, P) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ambrey Batiste, Annette Batiste, Bradford Calais re #2 Summons Issued - USA US Attorney General (aty,Centola, Lawrence) Modified on 7/8/2019 to indicate SEE Administrative Entry setting deadline (JonesSld, P). (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ambrey Batiste, Annette Batiste, Bradford Calais US Dept of Veterans Affairs (aty,Centola, Lawrence) Modified on 7/8/2019 to indicate SEE Administrative Entry setting deadline (JonesSld, P). (Entered: 07/05/2019)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3955367) filed by Ambrey Batiste, Bradford Calais, Annette Batiste. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Lawrence Joseph Centola, Jr added to party Ambrey Batiste, Annette Batiste, Bradford Calais(pty:pla))(aty,Centola, Lawrence) Modified on 5/22/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P). (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ambrey Batiste, Annette Batiste, Bradford Calais re #2 Summons Issued - USA US Attorney Western District of LA (aty,Centola, Lawrence) Modified on 7/8/2019 to indicate SEE Administrative Entry setting deadline (JonesSld, P). (Entered: 07/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bradford Calais, Ambrey Batiste, Annette Batiste U S Dept of Veterans Affairs served on 6/13/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: SEE PDF ATTACHED TO DOCUMENTS #3 , #4 AND #5 FOR SUMMONS RETURNS. (crt,JonesSld, P) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ambrey Batiste, Annette Batiste, Bradford Calais US Dept of Veterans Affairs (aty,Centola, Lawrence) Modified on 7/8/2019 to indicate SEE Administrative Entry setting deadline (JonesSld, P). (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ambrey Batiste, Annette Batiste, Bradford Calais re #2 Summons Issued - USA US Attorney Western District of LA (aty,Centola, Lawrence) Modified on 7/8/2019 to indicate SEE Administrative Entry setting deadline (JonesSld, P). (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ambrey Batiste, Annette Batiste, Bradford Calais re #2 Summons Issued - USA US Attorney General (aty,Centola, Lawrence) Modified on 7/8/2019 to indicate SEE Administrative Entry setting deadline (JonesSld, P). (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, U S Dept of Veterans Affairs, Megan Cobb (crt,JonesSld, P) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,JonesSld, P) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3955367) filed by Ambrey Batiste, Bradford Calais, Annette Batiste. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Lawrence Joseph Centola, Jr added to party Ambrey Batiste, Annette Batiste, Bradford Calais(pty:pla))(aty,Centola, Lawrence) Modified on 5/22/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P). (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.