This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/22/2021 at 09:25:01 (UTC).

Batista v. City of Providence et al

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 Batista filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against City of Providence. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia A. Sullivan and Mary S. McElroy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00138

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia A. Sullivan

Presiding Judge

Mary S. McElroy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose F. Batista

Defendants

Machiste Rankin

Kimberly Dy

Elise Swearingen

Deborah Wray

Phanida Phivilay

Michael Fontaine

Nicholas Figueroa

City of Providence

Susan DeRita

Kenneth Cohen

Providence External Review Authority Board

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William J. Conley, Jr.

Attorney at Law Office of William J. Conley Jr.

Hay Building, 123 Dyer Street, Unit 2B

Providence, RI 02903

Defendant Attorney

Megan K Maciasz DiSanto

Attorney at Senior Assistant City Solicitor

444 Westminster Street, Suite 220

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

#9

#8

#7

6 #6

Exhibit E

6 #5

Exhibit D

6 #4

Exhibit C

6 #3

Exhibit B

6 #2

Exhibit A

6 #1

Supporting Memorandum

#6

#5

4 #10

Summons

4 #9

Summons

4 #8

Summons

4 #7

Summons

4 #2

Summons

4 #1

Summons

#4

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Responses due by 6/11/2021 - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 5/4/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM deadline requested to extend to Friday, June 11, 2021 filed by Jose F. Batista. Responses due by 5/17/2021. (Conley, William) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Hearing re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Should It Aid The Court filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 5/11/2021. (DiSanto, Megan) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Megan K Maciasz DiSanto on behalf of All Defendants (DiSanto, Megan) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 5/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(DiSanto, Megan) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jose F. Batista of all Defendants (Conley, William) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL entered. Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy for all further proceedings- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/23/2021. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1605576 ), filed by Jose Batista. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - PERA 6.1.20 Letter, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - PERA Subpoena Request, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 - PERA October 21 email, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 - PERA 10.28.20 Letter, #5 Exhibit Ex 5 - PERA 11.9.20 Response, #6 Exhibit Ex 6 Executive Order, #7 Exhibit Ex 7 100 Person Limit, #8 Exhibit Ex 8 Job Description, #9 Exhibit Ex 9 PVD Comm Relations Act, #10 Exhibit Ex 10 PERA Ordinance, #11 Exhibit Ex 11 PERA Investigation, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons)(Conley, William) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL entered. Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy for all further proceedings- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/23/2021. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1605576 ), filed by Jose Batista. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - PERA 6.1.20 Letter, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - PERA Subpoena Request, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 - PERA October 21 email, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 - PERA 10.28.20 Letter, #5 Exhibit Ex 5 - PERA 11.9.20 Response, #6 Exhibit Ex 6 Executive Order, #7 Exhibit Ex 7 100 Person Limit, #8 Exhibit Ex 8 Job Description, #9 Exhibit Ex 9 PVD Comm Relations Act, #10 Exhibit Ex 10 PERA Ordinance, #11 Exhibit Ex 11 PERA Investigation, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons)(Conley, William) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less