This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:16:38 (UTC).

Bates v. Peters et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Bates filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Peters. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Staci G Cornelius and Abdul K Kallon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01188

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Staci G Cornelius

Presiding Judge

Abdul K Kallon

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Earl Eugene Bates, Jr

Bessemer, AL 35023

Respondents

Gwendolyn Givens

Jefferson J Dunn

Kenneth Peters

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appear in Court by Earl Eugene Bates, Jr. (AKD) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Earl Eugene Bates, Jr. (AKD) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING- Although the petitioner filed an application to proceed in forma pauperis, the application was not accompanied by a certified copy of jail and/or prison account statements for the last six months. The petitioner must file a new verified application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a certified copy of jail and/or prison account statements for the last six months. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 09/14/2020. (AKD) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Earl Eugene Bates, Jr. (MEB2) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING-Petitioner failed to file an application to proceed in forma pauperis or to pay the filing fee of $5.00. Petitioner must either file an application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the filing fee of $5.00. If Petitioner fails to correct the deficient pleading in compliance with this notice within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this notice, the court will dismiss this case for want of prosecution. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 08/21/2020. (AKD) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Earl Eugene Bates, Jr.(AKD) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear in Court by Earl Eugene Bates, Jr. (AKD) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Earl Eugene Bates, Jr. (AKD) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING- Although the petitioner filed an application to proceed in forma pauperis, the application was not accompanied by a certified copy of jail and/or prison account statements for the last six months. The petitioner must file a new verified application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a certified copy of jail and/or prison account statements for the last six months. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 09/14/2020. (AKD) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Earl Eugene Bates, Jr. (MEB2) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING-Petitioner failed to file an application to proceed in forma pauperis or to pay the filing fee of $5.00. Petitioner must either file an application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the filing fee of $5.00. If Petitioner fails to correct the deficient pleading in compliance with this notice within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this notice, the court will dismiss this case for want of prosecution. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 08/21/2020. (AKD) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Earl Eugene Bates, Jr.(AKD) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less