This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/28/2021 at 10:23:16 (UTC).

Bates v. Officer J. Granado et al

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 Bates filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Officer J Granado. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark Pittman and Hal R. Ray, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00607

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark Pittman

Referral Judge

Hal R. Ray, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dustin Lynn Bates

Fort Worth, TX 76196

Defendants

John Peter Smith Hospital

The City of Lake Worth Police Department

Tarrant County Sheriff's Department

Officer J. Granado

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott H Palmer

Attorney at Scott H Palmer PC

15455 Dallas Parkway, Suite 540 Lb 32

Addison, TX 75001

James Roberts

Attorney at Scott H Palmer PC

15455 Dallas Pkwy, Suite 540

Addison, TX 75001

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Dismissal VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(i) filed by Dustin Lynn Bates (Roberts, James) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#14

(#14) ORDER: It is ORDERED that the motion to compel discovery and for discovery (ECF Nos. #10 and #11 ) are DENIED. It is further ORDERED that if counsel wishes for the Court to review an updated pleading, they shall filed a second amended complaint, by no later than July 1, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 6/10/2021) (bdb) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Roberts on behalf of Dustin Lynn Bates. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Roberts, James) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott H Palmer on behalf of Dustin Lynn Bates. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Palmer, Scott) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#11

(#11) Motion for Discovery filed by Dustin Lynn Bates (wxc) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

10 #2

Exhibit(s)

10 #1

Exhibit(s)

#10

(#10) Motion to Compel filed by Dustin Lynn Bates (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (wxc) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

#8

(#8) FILING FEE ORDER... 1. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 such that his motions to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF Nos. #2 and #7 ) are GRANTED. 2. Although an initial partial filing fee of $3.57 is hereby assessed, the amount will not immediately be collected because Plaintiff presently lacks the requisite funds in his prison account to pay the initial partial filing fee. 3. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall, when funds exist in plaintiff's inmate trust account, forward to the Court an initial partial filing fee of $3.57. 4. Plaintiff shall pay $346.43, the balance of the filing fee, in monthly installments as provided in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 5/20/2021) (wxc) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

#7

(#7) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Dustin Lynn Bates (wxc) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Peter Smith Hospital, Officer J. Granado, Tarrant County Sheriff's Department, The City of Lake Worth Police Department filed by Dustin Lynn Bates. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wxc) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER...It is, therefore, ORDERED that Plaintiff shall either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, as well as file an Amended Complaint, on or before June 2, 2021. A form motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, a certified trust account statement, and the Courts civil rights form are available in the law library of the institution 2 in which Plaintiff is confined. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of the case without further notice. It is further ORDERED that, if Plaintiff wishes to have this case dismissed without curing deficiencies and without the assessment of any filing fees, he shall file a request for dismissal within ten (10) days of the date of this order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/3/2021) (wxc) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#4

(#4) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wxc) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Ray preliminarily assigned. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr. (wxc) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#2

(#2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Dustin Lynn Bates (wxc) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

1 #1

Additional Page(s)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against John Peter Smith Hospital, Officer J. Granado, Tarrant County Sheriff's Department, The City of Lake Worth Police Department filed by Dustin Lynn Bates. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (wxc) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated Per Notice of Dismissal #15 . (wxc) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Dismissal VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(i) filed by Dustin Lynn Bates (Roberts, James) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER: It is ORDERED that the motion to compel discovery and for discovery (ECF Nos. #10 and #11 ) are DENIED. It is further ORDERED that if counsel wishes for the Court to review an updated pleading, they shall filed a second amended complaint, by no later than July 1, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 6/10/2021) (bdb) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Roberts on behalf of Dustin Lynn Bates. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Roberts, James) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott H Palmer on behalf of Dustin Lynn Bates. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Palmer, Scott) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Motion for Discovery filed by Dustin Lynn Bates (wxc) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion to Compel filed by Dustin Lynn Bates (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (wxc) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE and Unsworn Declaration by Dustin Lynn Bates re #6 Amended Complaint. (tln) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Thu May 20 10:26:53 CDT 2021 (crt) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FILING FEE ORDER... 1. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 such that his motions to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF Nos. #2 and #7 ) are GRANTED. 2. Although an initial partial filing fee of $3.57 is hereby assessed, the amount will not immediately be collected because Plaintiff presently lacks the requisite funds in his prison account to pay the initial partial filing fee. 3. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall, when funds exist in plaintiff's inmate trust account, forward to the Court an initial partial filing fee of $3.57. 4. Plaintiff shall pay $346.43, the balance of the filing fee, in monthly installments as provided in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 5/20/2021) (wxc) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Dustin Lynn Bates (wxc) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Peter Smith Hospital, Officer J. Granado, Tarrant County Sheriff's Department, The City of Lake Worth Police Department filed by Dustin Lynn Bates. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wxc) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Mon May 3 14:47:05 CDT 2021 (crt) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER...It is, therefore, ORDERED that Plaintiff shall either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, as well as file an Amended Complaint, on or before June 2, 2021. A form motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, a certified trust account statement, and the Courts civil rights form are available in the law library of the institution 2 in which Plaintiff is confined. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of the case without further notice. It is further ORDERED that, if Plaintiff wishes to have this case dismissed without curing deficiencies and without the assessment of any filing fees, he shall file a request for dismissal within ten (10) days of the date of this order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/3/2021) (wxc) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3,4. Fri Apr 30 10:32:23 CDT 2021 (crt) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wxc) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Ray preliminarily assigned. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr. (wxc) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Dustin Lynn Bates (wxc) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against John Peter Smith Hospital, Officer J. Granado, Tarrant County Sheriff's Department, The City of Lake Worth Police Department filed by Dustin Lynn Bates. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (wxc) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tarrant County Sheriff Department is a litigant

Latest cases where John Peter Smith Hospital is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Roberts

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott H. Palmer