This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/19/2020 at 09:57:25 (UTC).

Bassily v. Louisville Ladder Inc et al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2020 Bassily filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Louisville Ladder Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Bruce Howe Hendricks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01120

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Bruce Howe Hendricks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fady Bassily

Defendants

Louisville Ladder Inc

Wal-Mart Stores East LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gene McCain Connell, Jr

Attorney at Kelaher Connell and Connor

Po Drawer 14547

Surfside Beach, SC 29587

Jason Preston Boan

Attorney at Boan Law Firm

Po Box 15849

Surfside Beach, SC 29587

Defendant Attorneys

Mark Steven Barrow

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow

Po Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29211

Richard Edward McLawhorn, Jr

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow

115 Cargill Way, Suite B

Hartsville, SC 29550

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

State Court Documents Summons and Complaint

1 #2

State Court Documents Amended Summons and Complaint

#2

#3

#5

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Fady Bassily.(Connell, Gene) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 10/30/2020, Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 5/5/2020. (vdru, ) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 5/26/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 6/9/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 6/9/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/30/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/30/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/31/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/31/2020, Discovery due by 10/30/2020, Motions due by 11/30/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 3/1/2021, Mediation Due by 10/30/2020, Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 5/5/2020. (vdru, ) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Gene McCain Connell, Jr for 7/13/20 thru 7/17/20; 9/11/20; 9/18/20; 9/25/20; 10/16/20; 10/23/20; 11/5/20 thru 11/9/20 (Connell, Gene) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Louisville Ladder Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (vdru, ) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Louisville Ladder Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East LP.(vdru, ) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Georgetown County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-22-00789. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9014784), filed by Louisville Ladder Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint, #2 State Court Documents Amended Summons and Complaint). (vdru, ) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOUISVILLE LADDER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gene McCain Connell, Jr