This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/27/2022 at 08:23:06 (UTC).

Bassfield IP LLC v. CEC Entertainment Concepts, L.P.

Case Summary

On 03/28/2022 Bassfield IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against CEC Entertainment Concepts, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00322

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bassfield IP LLC

Defendant

CEC Entertainment Concepts, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David R. Bennett

Defendant Attorney

Jon B. Hyland

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15859048), filed by Bassfield IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 6,641,053, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bennett, David) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 6,641,053

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Bennett, David) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bassfield IP LLC. (Bennett, David) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Bassfield IP LLC. (Bennett, David) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to CEC Entertainment Concepts, L.P. (zv) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#6

(#6) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jon B. Hyland on behalf of CEC Entertainment Concepts, L.P.. Attorney Jon B. Hyland added to party CEC Entertainment Concepts, L.P.(pty:dft) (Hyland, Jon) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by CEC Entertainment Concepts, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hyland, Jon) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by CEC Entertainment Concepts, L.P. re #1 Complaint (Hyland, Jon) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Bassfield IP LLC (Bennett, David) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#11

(#11) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot1) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/17/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot1) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Bassfield IP LLC (Bennett, David) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2022

DocketReset Deadlines: CEC Entertainment Concepts, L.P. answer due 5/30/2022. (zv) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by CEC Entertainment Concepts, L.P. re #1 Complaint (Hyland, Jon) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint . Pursuant to Standing Order Regarding Joint Or Unopposed Request To Change Deadlines - Paten Cases, this Motion should be filed as a Notice. Please refile using correct event. Thank you. (zv) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by CEC Entertainment Concepts, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hyland, Jon) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jon B. Hyland on behalf of CEC Entertainment Concepts, L.P.. Attorney Jon B. Hyland added to party CEC Entertainment Concepts, L.P.(pty:dft) (Hyland, Jon) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 04/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to CEC Entertainment Concepts, L.P. (zv) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2022

DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (zv) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2022

DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (zv) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Bassfield IP LLC. (Bennett, David) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bassfield IP LLC. (Bennett, David) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Bennett, David) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15859048), filed by Bassfield IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 6,641,053, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bennett, David) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less