This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/02/2020 at 07:07:59 (UTC).

Bassel v. WPP Group USA Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Bassel filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against WPP Group USA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roanne L. Mann and Pamela K. Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06827

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roanne L. Mann

Presiding Judge

Pamela K. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dr. Jamie Bassel

Jamie Bassel, D.C.

Defendants

WPP Group USA Inc.

Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Baglio, I

Attorney at Lewin & Baglio, LLP.

1100 Shames Drive, Suite 100

Westbury, NY 11590

Kellianne C Jones

1538 Mae Ave

Holbrook, NY 11741

Brendan J Kearns

Attorney at Lewin & Balgio, LLP

1100 Shames Dr

Westbury, NY 11590

Defendant Attorney

Amber Trumbull Wallace

Attorney at Denlea & Carton LLP

2 Westchester Park Drive, Suite 410

White Plains, NY 10604

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

10 #4

Exhibit 4

10 #3

Exhibit 3

10 #2

Exhibit 2

10 #1

Exhibit 1

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCase reopened. See minute entry dated 1/22/2020 in 19-cv-6826 (PKC). (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Kellianne C Jones on behalf of Jamie Bassel, DC (aty to be noticed) (Jones, Kellianne) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase Consolidated. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-06827-PKC-RLM et al. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. See Order in Lead Case, 19cv6826 dated 1/16/2020. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (Love, Alexis) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCase Consolidated. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-06826-PKC-RLM et al. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketORDER: In light of the relatedness of the cases, and the similar issues pending on dockets 1:19-cv-06826, 1:19-cv-06827, 1:19-cv-06828, 1:19-cv-06829, 1:19-cv-06830, 1:19-cv-06831, 1:19-cv-06832, 1:19-cv-06833, 1:19-cv-06836, 1:19-cv-06837, 1:19-cv-06838, 1:19-cv-06839, 1:19-cv-06840, 1:19-cv-06841, and 1:19-cv-06842, the Court consolidates all cases into the 19-cv-6826 docket. Any and all future entries are to be made in the 19-cv-6826 docket. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to consolidate the cases and terminate 1:19-cv-06827, 1:19-cv-06828, 1:19-cv-06829, 1:19-cv-06830, 1:19-cv-06831, 1:19-cv-06832, 1:19-cv-06833, 1:19-cv-06836, 1:19-cv-06837, 1:19-cv-06838, 1:19-cv-06839, 1:19-cv-06840, 1:19-cv-06841, and 1:19-cv-06842.All pending deadlines are adjourned sine die. The Court will hold a status conference on January 22, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4F North. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 1/16/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-06826-PKC-RLM et al. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCases association created. Lead: 1:19-cv-06826; Member: 1:19-cv-06827, 1:19-cv-06828, 1:19-cv-06829, 1:19-cv-06830, 1:19-cv-06831, 1:19-cv-06832, 1:19-cv-06833, 1:19-cv-06836, 1:19-cv-06837, 1:19-cv-06838, 1:19-cv-06839, 1:19-cv-06840, 1:19-cv-06841, and 1:19-cv-06842. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Requesting Conference by Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company, WPP Group USA Inc.. (Wallace, Amber) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann for all further proceedings. Judge Edward R. Korman, Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 1/15/2020. (Brown, Marc) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan J Kearns on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Kearns, Brendan) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter objecting to Aetna's request for an extension of time by Jamie Bassel, DC (Kearns, Brendan) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company answer due by 1/10/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 12/10/2019. (Several, Emily) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company. (Wallace, Amber) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward R. Korman and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Frederic Block, Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 12/5/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Related Case (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company from Queens Civil Court, case number CV-724308-19/QU. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12125506) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Wallace, Amber) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Baglio, I