This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:09:56 (UTC).

Bassel v. MTA New York City Transit et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Bassel filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against MTA New York City Transit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roanne L. Mann and Pamela K. Chen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06841

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roanne L. Mann

Presiding Judge

Pamela K. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dr. Jamie Bassel

Dr. Jamie Bassel, D.C.

Defendants

MTA New York City Transit

Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brendan J Kearns

Attorney at Lewin & Balgio, LLP

1100 Shames Dr

Westbury, NY 11590

Defendant Attorney

Amber Trumbull Wallace

Attorney at Denlea & Carton LLP

2 Westchester Park Drive, Suite 410

White Plains, NY 10604

 

Court Documents

#9

No Description Available

11 #1

Exhibit 1

#6

(#6) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan J Kearns on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Kearns, Brendan) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#5

(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#2

ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On December 9, 2019, after removing this action from state court, defendants filed a motion addressed to Judge Edward R. Korman, who is not assigned to this case, to request that he schedule a conference in this case, and in more than a dozen similar cases filed by the same plaintiff and removed to this District; defendants also requested a 30-day extension of time to respond to the complaint, over plaintiff's objection. On December 11, 2019, having received no ruling on their December 9th application, defendants filed, in four of the actions, a letter-motion addressed to this magistrate judge, and docketed as "Reply," requesting that the deadline for responding to the complaint in that case be extended until January 10, 2020. Later that day, defendants filed in each of those cases requests that the District Judge assigned to the case schedule a premotion conference to address defendants' planned motion to dismiss. In light of the pending motion for a premotion conference in each of the four cases to which this magistrate judge is assigned, this Court grants defendants' request for an extension of the deadline until January 10, 2020, over plaintiff's objection. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 12/13/2019. (Proujansky, Josh) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

9 #1

Exhibit Judge Korman's prior order

#8

(#8) Letter Pre-Motion Letter Request by Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company, MTA New York City Transit (Wallace, Amber) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

11 #4

Exhibit 4

11 #3

Exhibit 3

11 #2

Exhibit 2

#10

No Description Available

#13

(#13) MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Requesting Conference by Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company, MTA New York City Transit. (Wallace, Amber) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#3

(#3) Letter objecting to Aetna's request for extension of time by Jamie Bassel, DC (Kearns, Brendan) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#7

(#7) REPLY in Support of Aetna's Request for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company. (Wallace, Amber) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase Consolidated. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-06827-PKC-RLM et al. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase Consolidated with lead case 19-cv-6827 (PKC). (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. See Order in Lead Case, 19cv6826 dated 1/16/2020. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCase Consolidated. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-06826-PKC-RLM et al. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketORDER: In light of the relatedness of the cases, and the similar issues pending on dockets 1:19-cv-06826, 1:19-cv-06827, 1:19-cv-06828, 1:19-cv-06829, 1:19-cv-06830, 1:19-cv-06831, 1:19-cv-06832, 1:19-cv-06833, 1:19-cv-06836, 1:19-cv-06837, 1:19-cv-06838, 1:19-cv-06839, 1:19-cv-06840, 1:19-cv-06841, and 1:19-cv-06842, the Court consolidates all cases into the 19-cv-6826 docket. Any and all future entries are to be made in the 19-cv-6826 docket. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to consolidate the cases and terminate 1:19-cv-06827, 1:19-cv-06828, 1:19-cv-06829, 1:19-cv-06830, 1:19-cv-06831, 1:19-cv-06832, 1:19-cv-06833, 1:19-cv-06836, 1:19-cv-06837, 1:19-cv-06838, 1:19-cv-06839, 1:19-cv-06840, 1:19-cv-06841, and 1:19-cv-06842.All pending deadlines are adjourned sine die. The Court will hold a status conference on January 22, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4F North. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 1/16/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-06826-PKC-RLM et al. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCases associated. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCases association created. Lead: 1:19-cv-06826; Member: 1:19-cv-06827, 1:19-cv-06828, 1:19-cv-06829, 1:19-cv-06830, 1:19-cv-06831, 1:19-cv-06832, 1:19-cv-06833, 1:19-cv-06836, 1:19-cv-06837, 1:19-cv-06838, 1:19-cv-06839, 1:19-cv-06840, 1:19-cv-06841, and 1:19-cv-06842. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Requesting Conference by Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company, MTA New York City Transit. (Wallace, Amber) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen for all further proceedings. Judge Ann M Donnelly no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 1/14/2020. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for pre motion conference to move to dismiss Complaint by Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company, MTA New York City Transit. (Wallace, Amber) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketELECTRONIC ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On December 9, 2019, after removing this action from state court, defendants filed a motion addressed to Judge Edward R. Korman, who is not assigned to this case, to request that he schedule a conference in this case, and in more than a dozen similar cases filed by the same plaintiff and removed to this District; defendants also requested a 30-day extension of time to respond to the complaint, over plaintiff's objection. On December 11, 2019, having received no ruling on their December 9th application, defendants filed, in four of the actions, a letter-motion addressed to this magistrate judge, and docketed as "Reply," requesting that the deadline for responding to the complaint in that case be extended until January 10, 2020. Later that day, defendants filed in each of those cases requests that the District Judge assigned to the case schedule a premotion conference to address defendants' planned motion to dismiss. In light of the pending motion for a premotion conference in each of the four cases to which this magistrate judge is assigned, this Court grants defendants' request for an extension of the deadline until January 10, 2020, over plaintiff's objection. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 12/13/2019. (Proujansky, Josh) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter Pre-Motion Letter Request by Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company, MTA New York City Transit (Wallace, Amber) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPLY in Support of Aetna's Request for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company. (Wallace, Amber) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan J Kearns on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Kearns, Brendan) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter objecting to Aetna's request for extension of time by Jamie Bassel, DC (Kearns, Brendan) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company. (Wallace, Amber) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company from Queens Civil Court, case number CV-724300-19/QU. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12125785) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Wallace, Amber) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less