This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/02/2020 at 07:07:50 (UTC).

Bassel v. L'Oreal USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Bassel filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against L'Oreal USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roanne L. Mann and Pamela K. Chen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06826

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roanne L. Mann

Presiding Judge

Pamela K. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dr. Jamie Bassel

Dr. Jamie Bassel, D.C.

Defendants

L'Oreal USA, Inc.

Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Baglio, I

Attorney at Lewin & Baglio, LLP.

1100 Shames Drive, Suite 100

Westbury, NY 11590

Brendan J Kearns

Attorney at Lewin & Balgio, LLP

1100 Shames Dr

Westbury, NY 11590

Defendant Attorney

Amber Trumbull Wallace

Attorney at Denlea & Carton LLP

2 Westchester Park Drive, Suite 410

White Plains, NY 10604

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Colin O'Boyle Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12278816. by Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 O'Boyle Affidavit) (Wallace, Amber) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

13 #3

Exhibit 3

13 #2

Exhibit 2

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

(#9) REPLY in Support of Aetna's Request for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company. (Wallace, Amber) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge James Orenstein recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold for all further proceedings. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/11/2019. Motions referred to Steven M. Gold. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan J Kearns on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Kearns, Brendan) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#5

(#5) Letter objecting to Aetna's request for extension of time by Jamie Bassel, DC (Kearns, Brendan) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company. (Wallace, Amber) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#14

(#16) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jamie Bassel, DC of certain claims Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-06826-PKC-RLM, 1:19-cv-06831-PKC-RLM, 1:19-cv-06838-PKC-RLM (Kearns, Brendan) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#7

(#7) Notice of Related Case (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DISMISSING CASE: The #16 Voluntary Dismissal is So Ordered. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 1/23/2020. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jamie Bassel, DC of certain claims Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-06826-PKC-RLM, 1:19-cv-06831-PKC-RLM, 1:19-cv-06838-PKC-RLM (Kearns, Brendan) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pamela K. Chen: Status Conference held on 1/22/2020. Appearances by Kelliane Jones for Plaintiff; Amber Wallace and Colin O'Boyle for Defendants. Case called. Discussion held. Plaintiff stated that, in light of Judge Korman's recent ruling in 17-cv-5179, he will move to discontinue, i.e., dismiss with prejudice, the claims originally filed on dockets 19-cv-6826, 19-cv-6831, and 19-cv-6838. Additionally, the Court indicated that it will recuse itself from one of the previously consolidated cases, docket 19-cv-6840, due to a conflict of interest and will return the case to Judge Roslyn R. Mauskopf. The lead case will be 19-cv-6827 and going forward all filings should be made on that docket. The Court set the following expedited briefing scheduled for Plaintiff's remand motion and Defendants' motion to dismiss: (1) parties shall file their respective motions, as letters of no more than fifteen (15) pages, by February 12, 2020; (2) parties shall file their responses, as letters of no more than seven (7) pages, by March 4, 2020; and (3) parties shall file their replies, as letters of no more than five (5) pages, by March 18, 2020. The Court will hold oral argument on April 7, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4F North. (Court Reporter Linda Marino.) (Brodziak, Maya) Modified on 1/23/2020. (Abdallah, Fida). (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 1/22/2020. (LK) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Colin O'Boyle Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12278816. by Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 O'Boyle Affidavit) (Wallace, Amber) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCase Consolidated. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-06826-PKC-RLM et al. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketORDER: In light of the relatedness of the cases, and the similar issues pending on dockets 1:19-cv-06826, 1:19-cv-06827, 1:19-cv-06828, 1:19-cv-06829, 1:19-cv-06830, 1:19-cv-06831, 1:19-cv-06832, 1:19-cv-06833, 1:19-cv-06836, 1:19-cv-06837, 1:19-cv-06838, 1:19-cv-06839, 1:19-cv-06840, 1:19-cv-06841, and 1:19-cv-06842, the Court consolidates all cases into the 19-cv-6826 docket. Any and all future entries are to be made in the 19-cv-6826 docket. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to consolidate the cases and terminate 1:19-cv-06827, 1:19-cv-06828, 1:19-cv-06829, 1:19-cv-06830, 1:19-cv-06831, 1:19-cv-06832, 1:19-cv-06833, 1:19-cv-06836, 1:19-cv-06837, 1:19-cv-06838, 1:19-cv-06839, 1:19-cv-06840, 1:19-cv-06841, and 1:19-cv-06842.All pending deadlines are adjourned sine die. The Court will hold a status conference on January 22, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4F North. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 1/16/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-06826-PKC-RLM et al. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Requesting Conference by Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company, L'Oreal USA, Inc.. (Wallace, Amber) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann for all further proceedings. Judge Frederic Block, Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 1/14/2020. Motions referred to Roanne L. Mann. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER: The pre motion conference scheduled for January 31, 2020 @ 11AM is canceled, because this case will be re-assigned to J. Chen and MJ Mann as related to: CV-19-6836, Bassel vs. Bank of China. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other that this conference is canceled. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 1/14/2020. (Innelli, Michael) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPLY in Support of Aetna's Request for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company. (Wallace, Amber) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge James Orenstein recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold for all further proceedings. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/11/2019. Motions referred to Steven M. Gold. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Related Case (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan J Kearns on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Kearns, Brendan) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter objecting to Aetna's request for extension of time by Jamie Bassel, DC (Kearns, Brendan) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Motions referred to James Orenstein. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company. (Wallace, Amber) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company from Queens Civil Court, case number CV-724299-19/QU. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12125441) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Wallace, Amber) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Aetna Life and Health Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where L'Oreal USA S/D, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Baglio, I