This case was last updated from PACER on 11/08/2020 at 07:21:42 (UTC).

BASS v. SWANN

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 BASS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SWANN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-05811

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JENNIFER M BASS

Defendant

PATRICIA K SWANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J PHILLIP WARREN

Attorney at TAYLOR WARREN & WEIDNER PA - PENSACOLA FL

1700 W Main Street, Suite 100

Pensacola, FL 32502

Defendant Attorney

JESSICA M BOWEN

Attorney at HEATH & RASKY PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

2868 Remington Green Circle, Suite A

Tallahassee, FL 32308

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER. Notice of Stipulation of Parties Regarding Rule 26(A)(2) Disclosure Deadlines (construed as a motion to extend expert disclosure deadlines) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's expert disclosures are due no later than January 25, 2021, and Defendants expert disclosures are due no later than February 25, 2021. All other deadlines remain unchanged. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/6/2020. (alb) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION re #6 Scheduling Order,, Order Referring Case to Mediation, Joint Stipulation for Extension of 26(a)(2) Deadlines by JENNIFER M BASS. (WARREN, J) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

#6

(#6) FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL Re: #5 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.( Discovery due by 4/30/2021. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 5/21/2021. Mediation Report due by 6/11/2021. Motions due by 5/28/2021.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/27/2020. (alb) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#5

(#5) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (BOWEN, JESSICA) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#4

(#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/24 /2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/26/2020. Discovery due by 3/9/2021. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 09/10/2020. (alb) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT DOCS by PATRICIA K SWANN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (BOWEN, JESSICA) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BOWEN, JESSICA) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PATRICIA K SWANN from First Judicial Circuit in and for Okaloosa County, case number 20 CA 1460. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5641276.), filed by PATRICIA K SWANN. (BOWEN, JESSICA) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER. Notice of Stipulation of Parties Regarding Rule 26(A)(2) Disclosure Deadlines (construed as a motion to extend expert disclosure deadlines) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's expert disclosures are due no later than January 25, 2021, and Defendants expert disclosures are due no later than February 25, 2021. All other deadlines remain unchanged. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/6/2020. (alb) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #7 Stipulation of Parties Regarding Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosure Deadlines. (alb) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION re #6 Scheduling Order,, Order Referring Case to Mediation, Joint Stipulation for Extension of 26(a)(2) Deadlines by JENNIFER M BASS. (WARREN, J) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL Re: #5 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.( Discovery due by 4/30/2021. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 5/21/2021. Mediation Report due by 6/11/2021. Motions due by 5/28/2021.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/27/2020. (alb) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #5 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (alb) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (BOWEN, JESSICA) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/24 /2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/26/2020. Discovery due by 3/9/2021. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 09/10/2020. (alb) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (Please see proposed ISO.) (alb) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT DOCS by PATRICIA K SWANN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (BOWEN, JESSICA) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BOWEN, JESSICA) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PATRICIA K SWANN from First Judicial Circuit in and for Okaloosa County, case number 20 CA 1460. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5641276.), filed by PATRICIA K SWANN. (BOWEN, JESSICA) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less