This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/30/2021 at 09:50:43 (UTC).

Bass v. Eaton Hydraulics LLC

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 Bass filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Eaton Hydraulics LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy D. DeGiusti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00278

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy D. DeGiusti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Bass

Defendant

Eaton Hydraulics LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffery A Taylor

Attorney at Chadwick & Taylor

5613 N Classen Blvd

Oklahoma City, OK 73118

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew S Panach

Attorney at Fuller Tubb & Bickford PLLC

201 Robert S Kerr Ave, Suite 1000

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-8805

Tracey R Wallace

Attorney at Tracey Wallace

10007 Woodlake Drive

Dallas, TX 75243

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: Unless the Court directs otherwise, the case Scheduling Order will be issued based on the parties Joint Status Report. Should the Court decide that a scheduling conference is necessary, the conference will be conducted telephonically, pursuant to the Courts Chambers Rules located on the Courts website. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/24/2021. (mb) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ENTRY of Appearance by Tracey R Wallace on behalf of Eaton Hydraulics LLC (Wallace, Tracey) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2021 02:30 PM in Chambers before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Status Report due by 6/1/2021. (mb) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Eaton Hydraulics LLC . (Panach, Matthew) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Eaton Hydraulics LLC . (Panach, Matthew) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Eaton Hydraulics LLC.(Panach, Matthew) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Tracey R. Wallace. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 4/19/2021. (mb) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #4 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint Eaton Hydraulics LLC answer or response due 5/7/2021.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 4/19/2021. (mb) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3666379 by Eaton Hydraulics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request For Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Panach, Matthew) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Eaton Hydraulics LLC. (Panach, Matthew) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew S Panach on behalf of Eaton Hydraulics LLC (Panach, Matthew) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3654421. (Taylor, Jeffery) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Eaton Hydraulics LLC. (kmt) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Eaton Hydraulics LLC filed by James Bass. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EATON-HYDRAULICS INDIVIDUALLY & AS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tracey R Wallace

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew S Panach