Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2020 at 07:58:51 (UTC).

Baskin v. EC PAIA LLC

Case Summary

On 05/11/2020 Baskin filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EC PAIA LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judge overseeing this case is WES REBER PORTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00216

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hawaii District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WES REBER PORTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael S. Baskin

Paia Bay Properties LLC

Seashore Properties LLC

Paia Park, LLC

Paia Properties, LLC

Defendants

EC PAIA LLC

Doe Corporations 1-100

John Does 1-100

Jane Does 1-100

Doe Partnerships 1-100

Doe Entities 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Terrance M. Revere

Attorney at Revere & Associates, LLLC

970 North Kalaheo Avenue, Suite A-301

Kailua, HI 96734

Clarisse M. Kobashigawa

Attorney at Revere & Associates, LLLC

970 North Kalaheo Avenue, Suite A301

Kailua, HI 96734

Defendant Attorneys

Calvert G. Chipchase, IV

Attorney at Cades Schutte LLP

Cades Schutte Building, 1000 Bishop Street 12Th Flr, 521-9200

Honolulu, HI 96813

Lisa Katherine Swartzfager

Attorney at Case Schutte LLP

1000 Bishop Street, Ste. 1200

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DISQUALIFY THE LAW FIRM OF CADES SCHUTTE LLP re: #15 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 7/9/2020. (jo) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

15 #10

Certificate of Service

15 #9

Certificate of Compliance

15 #6

Exhibit 3

15 #5

Exhibit 2

15 #4

Exhibit 1

15 #3

Declaration of Counsel

15 #2

Declaration of Michael S. Baskin

#15

(#15) MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Terrance M. Revere appearing for Plaintiffs Michael S. Baskin, Paia Bay Properties LLC, Paia Park, LLC, Paia Properties, LLC, Seashore Properties LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Michael S. Baskin, #3 Declaration of Counsel, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Certificate of Compliance, #10 Certificate of Service)(Revere, Terrance) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#7

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EC PAIA LLC. (Swartzfager, Lisa) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance.In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jo) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

3 #1

Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement

#3

(#3) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 6/15/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

1 #3

Certificate of Service

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Declaration of Calvert G. Chipchase

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by EC PAIA LLC from Second Circuit Court, State of Hawaii, case number 2CCV-20-000097. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2370141), filed by EC PAIA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Calvert G. Chipchase, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Certificate of Service)(Chipchase, Calvert) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DISQUALIFY THE LAW FIRM OF CADES SCHUTTE LLP re: #15 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 7/9/2020. (jo) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE in Opposition PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT re #15 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Michael S. Baskin, Paia Bay Properties LLC, Paia Park, LLC, Paia Properties, LLC, Seashore Properties LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Baskin, #2 Declaration of Terrance M. Revere, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Certificate of Service)(Revere, Terrance) Docket Text Modified on 7/6/2020 (jo) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) EO: In light of the pending motion to dismiss, ECF No. #14 and pending motion to disqualify counsel, ECF No. #15 , the Court finds good cause to CONTINUE the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference from 7/07/2020 to 8/31/2020 at 09:30AM. The Court will be using AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296, Access Code 8224751.(MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STATEMENT in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by EC PAIA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Calvert G. Chipchase, #2 Appendix A, #3 Declaration of Roy A. Vitousek III, #4 Declaration of Christopher T. Goodin, #5 Declaration of Linda Tran, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G, #13 Exhibit H, #14 Exhibit I, #15 Exhibit J, #16 Exhibit K, #17 Exhibit L, #18 Exhibit M, #19 Exhibit N, #20 Exhibit O, #21 Exhibit P, #22 Certificate of Compliance with Local Rule 7.5, #23 Certificate of Service)(Chipchase, Calvert) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) EO: Finding good cause in support thereof, the Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion for First Extension of Time to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint, ECF No. #8 . Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal of the Complaint, filed on May 26, 2020, is deemed timely. See ECF No. #14 .The Court sets the following briefing schedule as to Plaintiffs' Motion to Disqualify the Law Firm of Cades Schutte LLP, ECF No. #15 : opposition shall be filed no later than June 18, 2020; reply shall be filed no later than July 2, 2020. Thereafter, the Court will determine whether to set a hearing or to resolve the Motion without a hearing.After the Motion to Disqualify is resolved, the Court will set a briefing schedule and hearing date for Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal, ECF No. #14 . IT IS ORDERED (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY re #13 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, for Extension of Time to File An Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by EC PAIA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Chipchase, Calvert) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY ENTRY-Exhibits Not Attached as Separate PDF'S - Please be advised that the exhibits included in Document #13 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion were not submitted as separate pdf attachments. See Section 5.0 Exhibits, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide, for additional instructions on how to file exhibits as separate attachments to the main document. No further action necessary. (jo) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY ENTRY-Exhibits Not Attached as Separate PDF'S - Please be advised that the exhibits included in Document #14 MOTION to Dismiss [Partial] were not submitted as separate pdf attachments. See Section 5.0 Exhibits, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide, for additional instructions on how to file exhibits as separate attachments to the main document. No further action necessary. (jo) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Terrance M. Revere appearing for Plaintiffs Michael S. Baskin, Paia Bay Properties LLC, Paia Park, LLC, Paia Properties, LLC, Seashore Properties LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Michael S. Baskin, #3 Declaration of Counsel, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Certificate of Compliance, #10 Certificate of Service)(Revere, Terrance) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Dismiss [Partial] Calvert G. Chipchase, IV appearing for Defendant EC PAIA LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Linda Tran, #2 Exhibits A and B, #3 Certificate of Service)(Chipchase, Calvert) Docket Text Modified on 5/29/2020 (jo) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Consent Election Form (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) EO: Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(c), the Court elects to decide Defendant's #8 Motion for First Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint without a hearing and directs briefing as follows: any opposition shall be filed by 5/26/20; reply shall be filed by 6/2/20. The Court notes that Defendant's Motion is titled "Ex Parte." See ECF No. #8 . "The expression 'ex parte motion' is a term of art. In its pure form it means a request a party makes to the court without any notice to the other side." Mission Power Engineering Co. v. Continental Cas. Co., 883 F. Supp. 488, 490 (C.D. Cal. 1995). Although Defendant's Motion is titled "Ex Parte," it was served on all parties as reflected on the Certificate of Service. See ECF No. 8 at 8. This motion will not be decided on an ex parte basis and any person can oppose such a motion. Accordingly, the Court disregards that portion of the title. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EX PARTE Motion for First Extension of Time to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint Lisa Katherine Swartzfager appearing for Defendant EC PAIA LLC (Swartzfager, Lisa) Docket Entry Modified on 5/19/2020 (jo) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent Election Form (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • Docket(#6) EO: The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 6/15/2020 at 9:00AM is ADVANCED to 08:30AM, the same day, before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. The Court will be using AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751.(MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EC PAIA LLC. (Swartzfager, Lisa) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance.In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jo) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 6/15/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00216 WRP on all further pleadings. (jo) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by EC PAIA LLC from Second Circuit Court, State of Hawaii, case number 2CCV-20-000097. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2370141), filed by EC PAIA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Calvert G. Chipchase, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Certificate of Service)(Chipchase, Calvert) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa Katherine Swartzfager