This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/20/2020 at 08:11:19 (UTC).

BASF CORPORATION et al v. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 BASF CORPORATION filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Beryl A. Howell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00487

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beryl A. Howell

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PROCAT TESTING LLC

COGNIS USA LLC

BASF CATALYSTS LLC

BASF CORPORATION

Defendants

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.

NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY

BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen R. Neuwirth

Attorney at QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Sami H. Rashid

Attorney at QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Viola Trebicka

Attorney at QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP

865 South Figueroa Street, 10Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant Attorneys

Linda Sue Stein

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

1330 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Molly Bruder Fox

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

1330 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#35

#34

#33

#32

#31

30 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#30

#29

28 #1

*Restricted*

8 #5

Certificate of Good Standing of Stephen R. Neuwirth for the SDNY

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Bruder Fox on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Fox, Molly) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Sue Stein on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Stein, Linda) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen R. Neuwirth on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Neuwirth, Stephen) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Appearance by Viola Trebicka on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Trebicka, Viola) (Entered: 03/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 18, 2020. (lcbah3) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING #30 Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 18, 2020. (lcbah3) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, COGNIS USA LLC, PROCAT TESTING LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rashid, Sami) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Appearance by Sami H. Rashid on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rashid, Sami) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 1:19-cv-21986. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the District of District of Columbia. (dd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/20/2020.] (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen R. Neuwirth by BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, COGNIS USA LLC, PROCAT TESTING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Stephen R. Neuwirth in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certification of Sandra L. Moser in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #4 Certificate of Good Standing of Stephen R. Neuwirth for the State of New York, #5 Certificate of Good Standing of Stephen R. Neuwirth for the SDNY)(MOSER, SANDRA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/20/2020.] (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service served on Amy Mclaren on 12/31/2019, filed by BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, COGNIS USA LLC, PROCAT TESTING LLC. (MOSER, SANDRA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/20/2020.] (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service served on Lynanne Gares on 12/31/2019, filed by BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, COGNIS USA LLC, PROCAT TESTING LLC. (MOSER, SANDRA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/20/2020.] (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service served on Amy Mclaren on 12/31/2019, filed by BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, COGNIS USA LLC, PROCAT TESTING LLC. (MOSER, SANDRA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/20/2020.] (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service served on Amy Mclaren on 12/31/2019, filed by BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, COGNIS USA LLC, PROCAT TESTING LLC. (MOSER, SANDRA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/20/2020.] (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/20/2020.] (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/20/2020.] (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketJudge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (mmb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/20/2020.] (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, COGNIS USA LLC, PROCAT TESTING LLC. (MOSER, SANDRA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/20/2020.] (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10208478) with JURY DEMAND, filed by COGNIS USA LLC, BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, PROCAT TESTING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MOSER, SANDRA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/20/2020.] (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COGNIS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BASF CATALYSTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Union Pacific Railroad Company is a litigant