This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/25/2020 at 07:20:15 (UTC).

BASF CORPORATION et al v. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 12/27/2019 BASF CORPORATION filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joel Schneider and Renee Marie Bumb. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-21986

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joel Schneider

Presiding Judge

Renee Marie Bumb

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PROCAT TESTING LLC

COGNIS USA LLC

BASF CATALYSTS LLC

BASF CORPORATION

Defendants

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.

NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY

BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANDRA L. MOSER

Attorney at QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN LLP

1300 I Street, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorneys

KEVIN M. MCDONOUGH

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS LLP

885 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

HONOR R. COSTELLO

Attorney at CROWELL & MORING LLP

590 Madison Avenue, 20Th Fl

New York, NY 10022-2544

TANSY WOAN

Attorney at SKADDEN, ARPS, SLATE, MEAGHER & FLOM LLP

151 W. 42Nd St

New York, NY 10036

VISHAL CHANDRA GUPTA

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

1114 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#27

25 #1

Proposed Order

#25

#24

9 #5

Certificate of Good Standing of Sami H. Rashid for the SDNY

9 #4

Certificate of Good Standing of Sami H. Rashid for the State of New York

9 #3

Proposed Order for Admission

9 #1

Certification of Sami H. Rashid in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCase transferred from New Jersey has been opened in District of Columbia as case 1:20-cv-00487, filed 02/20/2020. (dm) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCase extracted via ECF to District of District of Columbia. (dd, ) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the District of District of Columbia. (dd, ) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to Motion set for 3/2/2020 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, ) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) TEXT ORDER granting #25 Joint MOTION to Stay Regarding Initial Conference Deadlines. At the request of Counsel, the Initial Conference scheduled on 2/26/20 is POSTPONED. All current scheduling deadlines are stayed until the JPML is decided. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 2/6/2020. (se, ) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Joint MOTION to Stay Regarding Initial Conference Deadlines Under FRCP 26(a)(1) and (f) by UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(MCDONOUGH, KEVIN) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice fee received as to Sami Rashid and Stephen Neuwirth: $ 300, receipt number TRE109412 (abr) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Sami Rashid Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/30/2020. (rtm, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Stephen Neuwirth Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/30/2020. (rtm, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Order Initial Conference set for 2/26/2020 11:30 AM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/22/2020. (rtm, ) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen R. Neuwirth by BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, COGNIS USA LLC, PROCAT TESTING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Stephen R. Neuwirth in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certification of Sandra L. Moser in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #4 Certificate of Good Standing of Stephen R. Neuwirth for the State of New York, #5 Certificate of Good Standing of Stephen R. Neuwirth for the SDNY)(MOSER, SANDRA) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service served on Amy Mclaren on 12/31/2019, filed by BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, COGNIS USA LLC, PROCAT TESTING LLC. (MOSER, SANDRA) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service served on Lynanne Gares on 12/31/2019, filed by BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, COGNIS USA LLC, PROCAT TESTING LLC. (MOSER, SANDRA) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service served on Amy Mclaren on 12/31/2019, filed by BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, COGNIS USA LLC, PROCAT TESTING LLC. (MOSER, SANDRA) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service served on Amy Mclaren on 12/31/2019, filed by BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, COGNIS USA LLC, PROCAT TESTING LLC. (MOSER, SANDRA) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketJudge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (mmb, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, COGNIS USA LLC, PROCAT TESTING LLC. (MOSER, SANDRA) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10208478) with JURY DEMAND, filed by COGNIS USA LLC, BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, PROCAT TESTING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MOSER, SANDRA) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COGNIS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BASF CATALYSTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Union Pacific Railroad Company is a litigant