This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 17:25:43 (UTC).

Barwick v. Berman & Rabin PA

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 Barwick filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Berman Rabin PA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nancy Joseph. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00659

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy Joseph

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gerri Barwick

Defendant

Berman & Rabin PA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John D Blythin

Attorney at Ademi LLP

3620 E Layton Ave

Cudahy, WI 53110

Ben James Slatky

Attorney at Ademi LLP

3620 E Layton Ave

Cudahy, WI 53110

Jesse Fruchter

Attorney at Ademi LLP

3620 E Layton Ave

Cudahy, WI 53110

Mark A Eldridge

Attorney at Ademi LLP

3620 E Layton Ave

Cudahy, WI 53110

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A: letter from Defendant to Plaintiff

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Summons on Defendant

#2

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 5/28/2021. The plaintiff's motion to stay the motion for class certification #3 and motion for relief from the Local Rules setting an automatic briefing schedule #3 are GRANTED. For administrative purposes, it is necessary that the Clerk terminate the plaintiff's motion for class certification #3 . However, this motion will be regarded as pending to serve its protective purpose under Damasco v. Clearwire Corp., 662 F.3d 891, 896 (7th Cir. 2011). (cc: all counsel) (llc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Berman & Rabin PA. (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Certify Class (Fulton Dental / Damasco), Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Stay the motion to certify class until the scheduling conference, Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Relief from the Local Rules setting automatic briefing schedules and requiring briefs and supporting material to be filed with the motion (Civil L.R. 7(a), 7(d)) by Gerri Barwick. (Blythin, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by Gerri Barwick. (Blythin, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (class action) with Jury Demand; against Berman & Rabin PA by Gerri Barwick. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3828930) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: letter from Defendant to Plaintiff, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons on Defendant)(Blythin, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Berman & Rabin, P.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jesse Fruchter

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ben J Slatky