This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/09/2022 at 08:37:51 (UTC).

Barton v. Syngenta Crop Protection LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/08/2022 Barton filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Syngenta Crop Protection LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nancy J. Rosenstengel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-PQ-00227

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy J. Rosenstengel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patrick Barton

Defendants

Syngenta Crop Protection LLC

Syngenta AG

Chevron U.S.A. Inc.

Special Master

Randi Ellis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Russell Warren Lewis, IV

Attorney at Johnson Law Group

2925 Richmond Ave., Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77581

Khaldoun A. Baghdadi

Attorney at Walkup, Melodia, Kelly & Schoenberger

650 California Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Peter J. Flowers

Attorney at Meyers & Flowers, LLC

225 West Wacker Drive, Suite 1515

Chicago, IL 60606

Sarah Shoemake Doles

Attorney at Carey Danis & Lowe - St. Louis

8235 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63105

Defendant Attorneys

Bradley H. Weidenhammer

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP - Chicago

300 North Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

Leslie M. Smith

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP - Chicago

300 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Michael J. Nester

Attorney at Donovan Rose Nester, P.C.

15 North First Street, Suite A

Belleville, IL 62220

Ragan Naresh

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis - Washington DC

1301 Pennsylvania Ave. N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Rebecca C. Fitzpatrick

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP - Chicago

300 North Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

Jihan E. Walker

Attorney at Jones Day - Chicago

77 West Wacker Drive, Suite 3500

Chicago, IL 60601

Megan Ann Scheiderer

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP - Kansas City

4801 Main Street, Suite 1000

Kansas City, MO 64112

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Summons Requested. (Lewis, Russell) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Requested. (Lewis, Russell) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Syngenta Crop Protection LLC. Original summons mailed to Attorney Lewis. (lmb) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Syngenta Crop Protection LLC. Original summons mailed to Attorney Lewis. (lmb) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Requested. (Lewis, Russell) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Requested. (Lewis, Russell) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 22-pq-227-NJR. (jlrr) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4702082.), filed by Patrick Barton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, Russell) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less