This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/15/2019 at 08:05:31 (UTC).

Barton v. Rhodes et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2019 Barton filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Rhodes. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Keith F. Giblin and Ron Clark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:19-CV-00166

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Keith F. Giblin

Presiding Judge

Ron Clark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stanley Barton

Defendants

Celadon Trucking Services, Inc.

Quality Companies, LLC

Christopher Rhodes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey B Badders

Attorney at Badders Law Firm - Lufkin

1318 S John Redditt, Suite A

Lufkin, TX 75904

Defendant Attorneys

Robert James Collins

Attorney at Gauntt, Koen, Binney & Kidd, LLP

14643 Dallas Parkway, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75254

Karl Wayne Koen

Attorney at Gauntt, Koen, Binney & Kidd, LLP

14643 Dallas Parkway, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75254

Rachel Renee Vulpitta

Attorney at Gauntt, Koen, Binney & Kidd, LLP

14643 Dallas Parkway, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75254

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Quality Companies on 8/30/2019, filed by Stanley Barton. (Badders, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#12

(#12) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Celadon on 8/30/2019, filed by Stanley Barton. (Badders, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#11

(#11) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Christopher Rhodes on 8/30/2019, filed by Stanley Barton. (Badders, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference set before the undersigned at 2:00 p.m. on November 8, 2019, is CANCELLED. Docket Call and Final Pretrial Conference are set for 7/21/2020 at 2:00 PM in Ctrm 6 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. Jury Selection and Trial are set for 8/3/2020 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 102 (Lufkin) before District Judge Ron Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 11/6/19. (ljw, ) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rachel Renee Vulpitta on behalf of Celadon Trucking Services, Inc., Quality Companies, LLC, Christopher Rhodes (Vulpitta, Rachel) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE Initial Disclosure by Stanley Barton (Badders, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Celadon Trucking Services, Inc., Quality Companies, LLC, Christopher Rhodes (Koen, Karl) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before October 8, 2019. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference on November 8, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom #6, Jack Brooks Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 300 Willow Street, Beaumont, Texas before Magistrate Judge Giblin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 9/23/19. (ljw, ) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#4

(#4) *** ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT IN CAUSE NUMBER CV-00494-19-08 AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS DOC 2, ATTACHMENT 1 *** ORIGINAL ANSWER to #3 ORIGINAL PETITION by Celadon Trucking Services, Inc., Quality Companies, LLC, Christopher Rhodes.(ljw, ) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#3

(#3) ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT IN CAUSE NUMBER CV-00494-19-08 AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS DOC 2, ATTACHMENT 1*** ORIGINAL Petition against All Defendants, filed by Stanley Barton.(ljw, ) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

2 #1

Attachments

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Celadon Trucking Services, Inc., Quality Companies, LLC, Christopher Rhodes re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(Collins, Robert) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

1 #4

List of all Counsel of Record

1 #2

Index

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Christopher Rhodes, Quality Companies, LLC, Celadon Trucking Services, Inc. from 217th Judicial District, case number CV-00494-19-08. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7437533), filed by Christopher Rhodes, Quality Companies, LLC, Celadon Trucking Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Index, #3 Register of Action, #4 List of all Counsel of Record)(Collins, Robert) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Quality Companies on 8/30/2019, filed by Stanley Barton. (Badders, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Celadon on 8/30/2019, filed by Stanley Barton. (Badders, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Christopher Rhodes on 8/30/2019, filed by Stanley Barton. (Badders, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference set before the undersigned at 2:00 p.m. on November 8, 2019, is CANCELLED. Docket Call and Final Pretrial Conference are set for 7/21/2020 at 2:00 PM in Ctrm 6 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. Jury Selection and Trial are set for 8/3/2020 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 102 (Lufkin) before District Judge Ron Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 11/6/19. (ljw, ) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rachel Renee Vulpitta on behalf of Celadon Trucking Services, Inc., Quality Companies, LLC, Christopher Rhodes (Vulpitta, Rachel) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Collins, Robert) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE Initial Disclosure by Stanley Barton (Badders, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Celadon Trucking Services, Inc., Quality Companies, LLC, Christopher Rhodes (Koen, Karl) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before October 8, 2019. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference on November 8, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom #6, Jack Brooks Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 300 Willow Street, Beaumont, Texas before Magistrate Judge Giblin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 9/23/19. (ljw, ) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ljw, ) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) *** ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT IN CAUSE NUMBER CV-00494-19-08 AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS DOC 2, ATTACHMENT 1 *** ORIGINAL ANSWER to #3 ORIGINAL PETITION by Celadon Trucking Services, Inc., Quality Companies, LLC, Christopher Rhodes.(ljw, ) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT IN CAUSE NUMBER CV-00494-19-08 AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS DOC 2, ATTACHMENT 1*** ORIGINAL Petition against All Defendants, filed by Stanley Barton.(ljw, ) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. (ljw, ) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Case assigned to District Judge Ron Clark. (ljw, ) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by Celadon Trucking Services, Inc., Quality Companies, LLC, Christopher Rhodes re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(Collins, Robert) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Christopher Rhodes, Quality Companies, LLC, Celadon Trucking Services, Inc. from 217th Judicial District, case number CV-00494-19-08. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7437533), filed by Christopher Rhodes, Quality Companies, LLC, Celadon Trucking Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Index, #3 Register of Action, #4 List of all Counsel of Record)(Collins, Robert) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Quality is a litigant

Latest cases where CELADON TRUCKING SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachel Renee Vulpitta

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert James Collins