This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2021 at 10:13:47 (UTC).

Barton v. Randall et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2020 Barton filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Randall. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kristine G. Baker and Beth Deere. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01450

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

Referral Judge

Beth Deere

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brendon Barton

Calico Rock, AR 72519

Defendants

Dexter Payne

Davis

A Adams

K Wilson

P Gaines

Alsopp

Kenyan Randall

S Mathews

Broughton

Wendy Kelly

D Jackson

Warren

Sanders

Bass

Spillman

B Fletcher

A Campbell

Gurley

Does Chaplain; Head of Nursing; Sergeant

6 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to A Adams, Alsopp, Blount, Broughton, A Campbell, Culclager, Davis, B Fletcher, P Gaines, Gurley, D Jackson, Wendy Kelly, S Mathews, Dexter Payne, Kenyan Randall, Sanders, Smith, J Spears, Spillman, Warren, Williams, K Wilson and forwarded to the USMS for service. (ajt) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that Mr. Barton's claims against Defendants Jefferson and Bass be dismissed, without prejudice. Objections due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/28/2021. (jbh) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summonses for Defendants Randall, Gaines, Spillman, Davis, Sanders, Spears, Matthews, Jackson, Culclager, Williams, Smith, Wilson, Adams, Gurley, Alsopp, Broughton, Fletcher, Blount, Campbell, Warren, Payne, and Kelly; and directing the Marshal to serve these Defendants with summonses, copies of the #1 complaint and #5 amended complaint, plus attachments, without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/28/2021. (jbh) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Brendon Barton. (llg) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Mr. Barton has thirty days to file an amended complaint specifically explaining how each Defendant violated his rights and stating how each caused him to suffer injury. Mr. Barton's failure to comply with this Court's order could result in the dismissal of his complaint, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/7/2021. (jbh) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number LIT080191. (Original receipt mailed.) (llg) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS directing the Clerk of Court to enclose an IFP application, along with a copy of this Order; and directing Plaintiff to return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay a $402.00 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/14/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Brendon Barton. (llg) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gurley is a litigant

Latest cases where Bass is a litigant

Latest cases where SANDERS is a litigant

Latest cases where Warren is a litigant