This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/04/2020 at 09:00:42 (UTC).

Barton, et al v. Dresser, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2020 Barton filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Dresser, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr and Brian A. Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00502

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

Presiding Judge

Brian A. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michelle Barton

William Barton, Jr.

Defendants and Plaintiffs

Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality

Baker Hughes Holdings LLC

William Barton, Jr.

Dresser LLC

Baker Hughes Holdings, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott R. Bickford

Attorney at Martzell & Bickford

338 Lafayette St.

New Orleans, LA 70130

Neil F. Nazareth

Attorney at Martzell Bickford & Centola, A.P.C.

338 Lafayette Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jeremy James Landry

Attorney at Martzell, Bickford & Centola, A.P.C.

338 Lafayette Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Lawrence J. Centola, III

Attorney at Martzell & Bickford

338 Lafayette Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jason Zachary Landry

Attorney at Martzell & Bickford

338 Lafayette St.

New Orleans, LA 70130

Thomas Benjamin Wahlder

Attorney at Adams & Reese, LP-NO

701 Poydras Street, Suite 4500

New Orleans, LA 70139

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew M. Stakelum

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1100 Louisiana St., Suite 4000

Houston, TX 77002

Michael Cerniglia

Attorney at King & Jurgens, LLC

201 St. Charles Avenue, 45Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70170

Eric Earl Jarrell

Attorney at King, Krebs & Jurgens, PLLC

201 St. Charles Avenue, 45Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70170

Mitchell B. Bryant

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1100 Louisiana, Ste. 4100

Houston, TX 77002

Robert J. Burvant

Attorney at King, Krebs and Jurgens, PLLC

201 St. Charles Avenue, 45Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70170

 

Court Documents

6 #3

Proposed Order

6 #2

Exhibit B

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) Ex Parte MOTION for Mitchell B. Bryant to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2162187) by Baker Hughes Holdings, LLC, Dresser LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Stakelum, Andrew) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Baker Hughes Holdings, LLC, Dresser LLC identifying Other Affiliate Baker Hughes Company, Other Affiliate GE Oil & Gas US Holdings I, Inc., Other Affiliate EHHC NewCO LLC, Other Affiliate General Electric Company for Baker Hughes Holdings, LLC; Other Affiliate Baker Hughes Holdings LLC for Dresser LLC. (Stakelum, Andrew) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to First Amended and Supplemental Class Action Petition for Damages by Baker Hughes Holdings, LLC, Dresser LLC.(Stakelum, Andrew) Modified on 8/26/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW). (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Amended Civil Cover Sheet by Baker Hughes Holdings, LLC, Dresser LLC (Stakelum, Andrew) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit 1B

1 #2

Exhibit 1A

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number 697-052. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2152104), filed by Baker Hughes Holdings LLC, Dresser LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1A, #3 Exhibit 1B)(Stakelum, Andrew) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Mitchell B. Bryant to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel for Defendants Dresser, LLC and Baker Hughes Holdings, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/2/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 Ex Parte MOTION for Mitchell B. Bryant to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2162187). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Ex Parte MOTION for Mitchell B. Bryant to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2162187) by Baker Hughes Holdings, LLC, Dresser LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Stakelum, Andrew) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Baker Hughes Holdings, LLC, Dresser LLC identifying Other Affiliate Baker Hughes Company, Other Affiliate GE Oil & Gas US Holdings I, Inc., Other Affiliate EHHC NewCO LLC, Other Affiliate General Electric Company for Baker Hughes Holdings, LLC; Other Affiliate Baker Hughes Holdings LLC for Dresser LLC. (Stakelum, Andrew) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to First Amended and Supplemental Class Action Petition for Damages by Baker Hughes Holdings, LLC, Dresser LLC.(Stakelum, Andrew) Modified on 8/26/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW). (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Amended Civil Cover Sheet by Baker Hughes Holdings, LLC, Dresser LLC (Stakelum, Andrew) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • Docket(#2) Letter to Attorney Scott R. Bickford regarding Stephen J. Hecker who is Co-Counsel for party Michelle Barton and William Barton, Jr. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (SWE) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number 697-052. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2152104), filed by Baker Hughes Holdings LLC, Dresser LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1A, #3 Exhibit 1B)(Stakelum, Andrew) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality is a litigant

Latest cases where Dresser L L C is a litigant

Latest cases where BAKER HUGHES INCORPORATED is a litigant