This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/27/2022 at 07:06:17 (UTC).

Barton et al v. Dresser L L C et al

Case Summary

On 01/26/2022 Barton filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Dresser L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David C Joseph and Joseph H L Perez-Montes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00263

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Joseph

Referral Judge

Joseph H L Perez-Montes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michelle Barton

William Barton, Jr

Defendants

Dresser L L C

Baker Hughes Holdings L L C

LA Dept of Environmental Quality

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott R Bickford

Attorney at Martzell & Bickford

338 Lafayette St

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jason Z Landry

Attorney at Martzell & Bickford

338 Lafayette St

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jeremy James Landry

Attorney at Martzell & Bickford

338 Lafayette St

New Orleans, LA 70130

Lawrence J Centola, III

Attorney at Martzell & Bickford

338 Lafayette St

New Orleans, LA 70130

Neil Franz Nazareth

Attorney at Martzell & Bickford

338 Lafayette St

New Orleans, LA 70130

Thomas B Wahlder

1740 Jackson St

Alexandria, LA 71301

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew M Stakelum

Attorney at King & Spalding (HOU)

1100 Louisiana St Ste 4100

Houston, TX 77002

Oliver P Thoma

Attorney at King & Spalding (HOU)

1100 Louisiana St Ste 4100

Houston, TX 77002

Craig Andrew Stanfield

Attorney at King & Spalding (HOU)

1100 Louisiana St Ste 4100

Houston, TX 77002

Eric E Jarrell

Attorney at King & Jurgens

201 St Charles Ave Ste 4500

New Orleans, LA 70170-1034

Michael J Cerniglia

Attorney at King & Jurgens

201 St Charles Ave Ste 4500

New Orleans, LA 70170-1034

Mitchell Blake Bryant

Attorney at King & Spalding (HOU)

1100 Louisiana St Ste 4100

Houston, TX 77002

Robert J Burvant

Attorney at King & Jurgens

201 St Charles Ave Ste 4500

New Orleans, LA 70170-1034

Tracie Jo Renfroe

Attorney at King & Spalding (HOU)

1100 Louisiana St Ste 4100

Houston, TX 77002

Patrick Bayard McIntire

Attorney at Oats & Marino (LAF)

100 E Vermilion St Ste 400

Lafayette, LA 70501

 

Court Documents

#45

(#45) ORDER granting #40 Motion or Oliver P. Thoma to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/3/2022. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#44

(#44) ORDER granting #39 Motion Craig A. Stanfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/3/2022. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#43

(#43) ORDER granting #38 Motion for Tracie J. Renfroeto Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 2/3/2022. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

40 #2

Exhibit A

40 #1

Proposed order

#40

(#40) MOTION for Oliver P. Thoma to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4983436) by Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Dresser L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Exhibit A)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

39 #2

Exhibit A

39 #1

Proposed order

#39

(#39) MOTION for Craig A. Stanfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4983418) by Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Dresser L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Exhibit A)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

6 #3

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Baker Hughes Holdings, LLC, Dresser LLC identifying Other Affiliate Baker Hughes Company, Other Affiliate GE Oil & Gas US Holdings I, Inc., Other Affiliate EHHC NewCO LLC, Other Affiliate General Electric Company for Baker Hughes Holdings, LLC; Other Affiliate Baker Hughes Holdings LLC for Dresser LLC. (Stakelum, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/28/2022.] (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to First Amended and Supplemental Class Action Petition for Damages by Baker Hughes Holdings, LLC, Dresser LLC.(Stakelum, Andrew) Modified on 8/26/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/28/2022.] (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Amended Civil Cover Sheet by Baker Hughes Holdings, LLC, Dresser LLC (Stakelum, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/28/2022.] (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#2

(#2) Letter to Attorney Scott R. Bickford regarding Stephen J. Hecker who is Co-Counsel for party Michelle Barton and William Barton, Jr. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (SWE) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/28/2022.] (Entered: 08/06/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit 1B

1 #2

Exhibit 1A

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number 697-052. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2152104), filed by Baker Hughes Holdings LLC, Dresser LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1A, #3 Exhibit 1B)(Stakelum, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/28/2022.] (Entered: 08/05/2020)

82 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • Docket(#46) MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes: VIDEO STATUS CONFERENCE held on 2/10/2022. Attorney Jeremy Landry and Lawrence Centola for Plaintiffs, Eric Jarrell, Andrew Stakelum and Tracie Renfroe for Dresser LLC, Patrick McIntire for LA Dept of Environmental Quality all appear by video. The Court and the parties discussed the status of discovery, motion practice, and future conferences. The Court advised that the parties should file motions in specific instances of disagreement regarding the scope of discovery. The Court will also conduct separate status conferences in newly-filed or transferred cases. (Court Reporter: VTC) (crt,Tice, Y) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) ORDER granting #40 Motion or Oliver P. Thoma to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/3/2022. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) ORDER granting #39 Motion Craig A. Stanfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/3/2022. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ORDER granting #38 Motion for Tracie J. Renfroeto Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 2/3/2022. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ORDER granting #37 Motion for Mitchell B. Bryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/3/2022. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ORDER granting #36 Motion for Hearing A Status Conference is set for 2/10/2022 at 10:00 AM by video conference before the undersigned. An email with the link access will be sent prior to the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 2/3/2022. (crt,Tice, Y) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MOTION for Oliver P. Thoma to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4983436) by Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Dresser L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Exhibit A)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MOTION for Craig A. Stanfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4983418) by Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Dresser L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Exhibit A)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MOTION for Tracie J. Renfroe to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4983403) by Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Dresser L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Exhibit A)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MOTION for Mitchell B. Bryant to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4983380) by Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Dresser L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Exhibit A)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Corrected Certification of State Court Record by Baker Hughes Holdings, LLC, Dresser LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stakelum, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/28/2022.] (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/1/2020 at 09:30 AM in by video. Status Report due by 11/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/14/2020. (SWE) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/28/2022.] (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Mitchell B. Bryant to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel for Defendants Dresser, LLC and Baker Hughes Holdings, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/2/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/28/2022.] (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 Ex Parte MOTION for Mitchell B. Bryant to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2162187). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/28/2022.] (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Ex Parte MOTION for Mitchell B. Bryant to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2162187) by Baker Hughes Holdings, LLC, Dresser LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Stakelum, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/28/2022.] (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Baker Hughes Holdings, LLC, Dresser LLC identifying Other Affiliate Baker Hughes Company, Other Affiliate GE Oil & Gas US Holdings I, Inc., Other Affiliate EHHC NewCO LLC, Other Affiliate General Electric Company for Baker Hughes Holdings, LLC; Other Affiliate Baker Hughes Holdings LLC for Dresser LLC. (Stakelum, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/28/2022.] (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to First Amended and Supplemental Class Action Petition for Damages by Baker Hughes Holdings, LLC, Dresser LLC.(Stakelum, Andrew) Modified on 8/26/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/28/2022.] (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Amended Civil Cover Sheet by Baker Hughes Holdings, LLC, Dresser LLC (Stakelum, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/28/2022.] (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter to Attorney Scott R. Bickford regarding Stephen J. Hecker who is Co-Counsel for party Michelle Barton and William Barton, Jr. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (SWE) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/28/2022.] (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number 697-052. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2152104), filed by Baker Hughes Holdings LLC, Dresser LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1A, #3 Exhibit 1B)(Stakelum, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/28/2022.] (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dresser L L C is a litigant

Latest cases where BAKER HUGHES INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mitchell Blake Bryant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick Bayard McIntire