This case was last updated from PACER on 08/14/2021 at 08:45:52 (UTC).

Bartolo v. Pfizer Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 Bartolo filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Pfizer Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robin L. Rosenberg and Bruce E. Reinhart. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-81076

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

Referral Judge

Bruce E. Reinhart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Bartolo

Defendants

Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., f/k/a Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc.

L. Perrigo Co.

Pfizer Inc.

235 East 42Nd Street

New York, NY 10017

Strides Pharma Inc.

Albertson's Companies, Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation

900 Ridgebury Road

Ridgebury, CT 06877

Geri-Care Pharmaceuticals Corp.

1650 63Rd St.

Brooklyn, NY 11204

Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH

Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation

Walgreen Co.

Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V.

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Apotex Corporation,

Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.

Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James P. Ginzkey

Attorney at Ginzkey Law Office

221 E. Washington St.

Bloomington, IL 61701

 

Court Documents

#4

(#3) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • Docket(#4) MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81076-RLR Bartolo v. Pfizer Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCases associated 9:20-md-2924-RLR. (mc) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14770661, filed by Joseph Bartolo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Ginzkey, James) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Geri-Care Pharmaceuticals Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Strides Pharma, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH is a litigant