This case was last updated from PACER on 03/12/2019 at 07:46:33 (UTC).

Bartlow v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 Bartlow filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert D. Mariani and A. Richard Caputo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00074

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Robert D. Mariani

A. Richard Caputo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shaun Bartlow

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edwin A. Abrahamsen, Jr.

Attorney at Abrahmasen Conaboy & Abrahamsen, P.C.

1006 Pittston Ave.

Scranton, PA 18505

Defendant Attorney

Gary A. Drakas

Attorney at Forry Ullman

One Bethlehem Plaza, Broad And New Streets, Suite 400

Bethlehem, PA 18018

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company.(Drakas, Gary) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION to Amend Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Order)(Drakas, Gary) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 2/5/19. (dw) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

4 #2

Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - State Farm Policy

4 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company, filed by Shaun Bartlow. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - State Farm Policy)(Abrahamsen, Edwin) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

3 #5

Certificate of Nonconcurrence

3 #4

Proposed Order

3 #3

Exhibit(s) C - State Farm Letter

3 #2

Exhibit(s) B - Release

3 #1

Exhibit(s) A - Plaintiff's Complaint

#3

(#3) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Release, #3 Exhibit(s) C - State Farm Letter, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Nonconcurrence)(Drakas, Gary) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company. (bg) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company.(Drakas, Gary) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION to Amend Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Order)(Drakas, Gary) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 2/5/19. (dw) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company, filed by Shaun Bartlow. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - State Farm Policy)(Abrahamsen, Edwin) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Release, #3 Exhibit(s) C - State Farm Letter, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Nonconcurrence)(Drakas, Gary) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Caputo. (dmn) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company. (bg) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company from Luzerne County, case number 2018-13737. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4645692), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bg) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant