This case was last updated from PACER on 09/22/2021 at 07:20:31 (UTC).

Bartlett et al v. Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL et al

Case Summary

On 01/01/2019 Bartlett filed an Other lawsuit against Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Vera M. Scanlon, Carol Bagley Amon and Taryn A. Merkl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00007

  • Filing Date:

    01/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carol Bagley Amon

Referral Judges

Vera M. Scanlon

Taryn A. Merkl

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Steven W. Hiller

Linda Jones

Marvise L. Crockett

Gilbert Arsiaga, Jr.

Robert Bartlett

George Arsiaga

Tracie Arsiaga

Patricia Arsiaga

Sylvia Macias

Jeremy Church

Robi Ann Galindo

Maxine E. Crockett

Defendants

Fransabank SAL

Bank of Beirut SAL

Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL

Byblos Bank SAL

Lebanon and Gulf Bank SAL

Bank Audi SAL

Jammal Trust Bank SAL

Banque Libano-Francaise SAL

1,102 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Adam Friedman

Attorney at OSEN LLC

2 University Plaza Drive, Suite 402

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Gerard Filitti

Attorney at The Lawfare Project

633 3Rd Avenue, 21St Floor

New York, NY 10017

Aaron Schlanger

Attorney at Osen LLC

2 University Plaza, Suite 201

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Ari Ungar

Attorney at Osen LLC

2 University Plaza, Suite 201

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Naomi B Weinberg

Attorney at Osen LLC

2 University Plaza, Suite 201

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Clyde T. Turner

Attorney at Turner and Associates

4705 Somers Ave, Suite 100

North Little Rock, AR 72116

Defendant Attorneys

Linda C. Goldstein

Attorney at Dechert LLP

1095 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Michael Sullivan

Attorney at Ashcroft Law Firm, LLC

200 State Street, 7, Boston

Boston, MA 02109

Jonathan D. Siegfried

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Douglas Walter Mateyaschuk, II

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Gassan Adnan Baloul

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP

2550 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Joseph Stewart Alonzo

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP

30 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10112

Christopher James Houpt

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Andrew J. Pincus

Attorney at Mayer Brown, LLP

1999 K Steet Nw

Washington, DC 20006

David B. Rivkin, Jr.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

Suite 1100, 1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Kendall Eugene Wangsgard

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

1050 Connecticut Ave, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Reuben J. Sequeira, II

701 13Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Christopher Mark Curran

Attorney at White & Case LLP

701 Thirteenth Street

Washington, DC 20005

Mark G. Hanchet

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Other Attorneys

David D. Lin

Attorney at Lewis & Lin, LLC

81 Prospect Street, Suite 8001

Brooklyn, NY 11201

33 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#255

(#255) Letter MOTION for Discovery of Third Party Records by All Plaintiffs. (Radine, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

#254

(#254) Letter re: Courtesy Copies of Motion Papers by Bank of Beirut SAL (Weisburg, Henry) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#253

(#253) Letter re Courtesy Copies of Motion Papers by BLOM Bank SAL, Bank Audi SAL, Bank of Beirut SAL, Bank of Beirut and the Arab Countries SAL, Banque Libano-Francaise SAL, Byblos Bank SAL, Fenicia Bank, Fransabank SAL, Lebanon and Gulf Bank SAL, Middle East Africa Bank SAL, Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL (Goldstein, Linda) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#252

(#252) Letter re: Courtesy Copies of Amended Motion to Dismiss In Light of Recent Second Circuit Authority by Muhammad Baasiri, Jammal Trust Bank SAL (Rivkin, David) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#251

(#251) REPLY in Support re #206 MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Bank of Beirut SAL's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by Bank of Beirut SAL. (Weisburg, Henry) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#250

(#250) REPLY in Support re #209 MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Moving Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint, #223 Memorandum in Support, filed by BLOM Bank SAL, Bank Audi SAL, Bank of Beirut SAL, Bank of Beirut and the Arab Countries SAL, Banque Libano-Francaise SAL, Byblos Bank SAL, Fenicia Bank, Fransabank SAL, Lebanon and Gulf Bank SAL, Middle East Africa Bank SAL, Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL. (Goldstein, Linda) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

209 #2

Declaration of Linda C. Goldstein

209 #209

Main Document

#206

(#249) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #209 MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Moving Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint, #245 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Light of Recent Second Circuit Authority, #206 MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Bank of Beirut SAL's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Osen, Gary) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Cindy T. Schlanger on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Schlanger, Cindy) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Ari Ungar on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Ungar, Ari) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary M. Osen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Osen, Gary) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Schlanger on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Schlanger, Aaron) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11063587 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Matthew Arsiaga, Tracie Arsiaga, Steven W. Hiller, Terrel Charles Bartlett, Robert Bartlett, Jeremy Church, Steven Greenwood, Robi Ann Galindo, Marvise L. Crockett, Linda Jones, Gilbert Arsiaga, Jr, Angel Munoz, Cedric Hunt, Patricia Arsiaga, Ingrid Fisher, Sylvia Macias, Shawn Bartlett, George Arsiaga, Sandra Hankins, Maxine E. Crockett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2) (Friedman, William) (Entered: 01/01/2019)

505 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketORDER. Pursuant to EDNY Local Rule 6.1(a), Defendants are directed to respond to Plaintiffs' Letter Motion for Discovery with any opposing affidavits and answering memoranda of law by 9/27/2021. Plaintiffs are directed to reply within two days after service of the answering papers. A telephonic Status Conference will take place on 10/8/2021 at 4:15 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl. The parties are directed to call the toll-free number (877) 336-1839. The access code is 3914302. The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl on 9/21/2021. (Devanathan, Deepa) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#255) Letter MOTION for Discovery of Third Party Records by All Plaintiffs. (Radine, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#254) Letter re: Courtesy Copies of Motion Papers by Bank of Beirut SAL (Weisburg, Henry) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#253) Letter re Courtesy Copies of Motion Papers by BLOM Bank SAL, Bank Audi SAL, Bank of Beirut SAL, Bank of Beirut and the Arab Countries SAL, Banque Libano-Francaise SAL, Byblos Bank SAL, Fenicia Bank, Fransabank SAL, Lebanon and Gulf Bank SAL, Middle East Africa Bank SAL, Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL (Goldstein, Linda) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#252) Letter re: Courtesy Copies of Amended Motion to Dismiss In Light of Recent Second Circuit Authority by Muhammad Baasiri, Jammal Trust Bank SAL (Rivkin, David) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#251) REPLY in Support re #206 MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Bank of Beirut SAL's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by Bank of Beirut SAL. (Weisburg, Henry) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#250) REPLY in Support re #209 MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Moving Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint, #223 Memorandum in Support, filed by BLOM Bank SAL, Bank Audi SAL, Bank of Beirut SAL, Bank of Beirut and the Arab Countries SAL, Banque Libano-Francaise SAL, Byblos Bank SAL, Fenicia Bank, Fransabank SAL, Lebanon and Gulf Bank SAL, Middle East Africa Bank SAL, Societe Generale de Banque au Liban SAL. (Goldstein, Linda) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#249) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #209 MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Moving Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint, #245 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Light of Recent Second Circuit Authority, #206 MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Bank of Beirut SAL's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Osen, Gary) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#248) NOTICE of Appearance by George E. Anhang on behalf of Bank of Beirut SAL (aty to be noticed) (Anhang, George) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#247) REPLY in Support re #245 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Light of Recent Second Circuit Authority filed by Muhammad Baasiri, Jammal Trust Bank SAL. (Rivkin, David) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
298 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Nina Gershon and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard Filitti on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Filitti, Gerard) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Dina Gielchinsky on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Gielchinsky, Dina) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Cindy T. Schlanger on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Schlanger, Cindy) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Ari Ungar on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Ungar, Ari) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary M. Osen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Osen, Gary) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Schlanger on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Schlanger, Aaron) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11063587 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Matthew Arsiaga, Tracie Arsiaga, Steven W. Hiller, Terrel Charles Bartlett, Robert Bartlett, Jeremy Church, Steven Greenwood, Robi Ann Galindo, Marvise L. Crockett, Linda Jones, Gilbert Arsiaga, Jr, Angel Munoz, Cedric Hunt, Patricia Arsiaga, Ingrid Fisher, Sylvia Macias, Shawn Bartlett, George Arsiaga, Sandra Hankins, Maxine E. Crockett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2) (Friedman, William) (Entered: 01/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of Beirut SAL is a litigant