This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/10/2022 at 07:36:49 (UTC).

Bartholomew et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al

Case Summary

On 10/11/2022 Bartholomew filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Bernard M. Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00881

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Bernard M. Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bart Bartholomew

Terry Bartholomew

Defendants

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Greg Ellis Insurance Agency Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Carole L Dulisse

Attorney at Marr Law Firm

4301 Sw 3Rd St, Suite 110

Oklahoma City, OK 73108

Chad E Ihrig

Attorney at Nix Patterson LLP - AUSTIN

8701 Bee Cave Road, Building 1

Austin, TX 78746

Jeffrey D Marr

Attorney at Marr Law Firm

4301 Sw 3Rd St, Suite 110

Oklahoma City, OK 73108

Michael Burrage

Attorney at Whitten Burrage

512 N Broadway Ave, Suite 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Nicholas A Marr

Attorney at Nix Patterson LLP - OKC

512 N Broadway Ave, Suite 206

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Reggie N Whitten

Attorney at Whitten Burrage

512 N Broadway Ave, Suite 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

J Revell Parrish

Attorney at Whitten Burrage

512 N Broadway Ave, Suite 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorneys

Paige A Masters

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy-OKC

Braniff Building, 324 N Robinson Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Timila S Rother

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy-OKC

Braniff Building, 324 N Robinson Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Marr, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

14 #4

Exhibit Sang Petition

14 #3

Exhibit Policy

14 #2

Exhibit Renewal Declarations

14 #1

Exhibit Chart of Cases

14 #14

Main Document

13 #1

Exhibit 1 - Chart of Cases

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) RESPONSE re #7 Notice (other) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Parrish, J) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

#11

(#11) ENTRY of Appearance by J Revell Parrish on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Parrish, J) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

#10

(#10) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael Burrage on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Burrage, Michael) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

#9

(#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Reggie N Whitten on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Whitten, Reggie) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Plaintiffs' Petition by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Rother, Timila) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE (other) by Greg Ellis Insurance Agency Inc Notice in Lieu of a Responsive Pleading Because it is a Fraudulently Joined Defendant (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

#6

(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Carole L Dulisse on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dulisse, Carole) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#5

(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey D Marr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Marr, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Paige A Masters on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Masters, Paige) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company . (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Marr, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chart of Cases, #2 Exhibit Renewal Declarations, #3 Exhibit Policy, #4 Exhibit Sang Petition)(Rother, Timila) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Chart of Cases)(Marr, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE re #7 Notice (other) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Parrish, J) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ENTRY of Appearance by J Revell Parrish on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Parrish, J) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael Burrage on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Burrage, Michael) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Reggie N Whitten on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Whitten, Reggie) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Plaintiffs' Petition by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Rother, Timila) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE (other) by Greg Ellis Insurance Agency Inc Notice in Lieu of a Responsive Pleading Because it is a Fraudulently Joined Defendant (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Carole L Dulisse on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dulisse, Carole) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey D Marr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Marr, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Paige A Masters on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Masters, Paige) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company . (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Timila S Rother on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-4009719. (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cleveland County District Court, case number CJ-2022-454 filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - OID Service Docs, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ekw) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timila S Rother

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paige A Masters