This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/14/2023 at 07:36:43 (UTC).

Bartch v. Barch et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Bartch filed an Other lawsuit against Barch. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lydia Kay Griggsby. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00101

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lydia Kay Griggsby

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Bartch

Defendants

Mackie A. Barch

Trellis Holdings Maryland, Inc.

Garnishees

Culta, LLC

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Severn Savings Bank, F.S.B.

Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC

Shore United Bank, N.A.

Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan Helfgott

Attorney at Lahti Helfgott LLC

1624 Market Street, Suite 202

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorney

David S Musgrave

Attorney at Gordon Feinblatt LLC

233 E Redwood St

Baltimore, MD 21202

Garnishee Attorneys

Stephanie Kaye Baron

Attorney at Miles & Stockbridge P.C.

100 Light Street

Baltimore, MD 21202

Michael Benjamin Brown

Attorney at Miles & Stockbridge, P.C.

100 Light Street

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

48 #2

Exhibit A to the Declaration of Jonathan A. Helfgott

37 #3

Text of Proposed Order

37 #2

Exhibit 2 Affidavit of Mackie A. Barch

37 #1

Exhibit 1 Morgan Stanley IRA Account

36 #1

Exhibit 1 Fidelity IRA Account

36 #36

Main Document

35 #3

Text of Proposed Order

35 #2

Exhibit 2 Affidavit of Mackie A. Barch

35 #35

Main Document

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

4 #4

Main Document

3 #1

Exhibit 1 - Amended Judgment in Bartch v. Barch et al., Case No. 18-cv-03016 in

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Helfgott on behalf of David Bartch (Helfgott, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

1 #2

Cover Letter

1 #1

Judgment

1 #1

Main Document

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) RESPONSE to Motion re #35 MOTION for Return of Property , #37 MOTION for Return of Property , #36 MOTION for Return of Property filed by David Bartch. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jonathan A. Helfgott, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Jonathan A. Helfgott)(Helfgott, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Kaye Baron on behalf of Culta, LLC (Baron, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Benjamin Brown on behalf of Culta, LLC (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) (FILED IN ERROR - TO BE REFILED) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Benjamin Brown on behalf of Culta, LLC (Brown, Michael) Modified on 1/11/2023 (hmls, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment of Property - Trellis Holdings Maryland by Culta, LLC. (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment of Wages - Trellis Holdings Maryland by Culta, LLC. (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment of Property - Mackie A. Barch by Culta, LLC. (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment of Wages - Mackie A. Barch by Culta, LLC. (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REQUEST for Writ of Garnishment of Account in Financial Institution - Severn Savings Bank, F.S.B., Account of Trellis Holdings Maryland, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Helfgott, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REQUEST for Writ of Garnishment of Account in Financial Institution - Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., accounts of Trellis Holdings Maryland, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Helfgott, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST for Writ of Garnishment of Account in Financial Institution - Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Helfgott, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST for Writ of Garnishment of Wages of Mackie A. Barch (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Helfgott, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST for Writ of Garnishment of Wages of Trellis Holdings Maryland, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Helfgott, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST for Writ of Garnishment of Property Other than Wages (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Helfgott, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment of Property Other than Wages (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Helfgott, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by David Bartch of Amended Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Judgment in Bartch v. Barch et al., Case No. 18-cv-03016 in the United States District Court for the District of Colorado)(Helfgott, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Helfgott on behalf of David Bartch (Helfgott, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REGISTRATION of Foreign Judgment entered in the District of Colorado in favor of David Bartch and against Mackie A. Barch and Trellis Holdings Maryland, Inc. in the amount of $6.4 Million with reasonable costs taxed by the Clerk. FILING FEE $49.00 RECEIPT #2149. (Attachments: #1 Final Judgment)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2022: #2 Cover Letter) (hmls, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less