This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:30:21 (UTC).

Barsir v. Manor Care of Potomac MD, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Barsir filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Manor Care of Potomac MD, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is George Jarrod Hazel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-03493

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George Jarrod Hazel

 

Party Details

Appellant and Debtor

Aletha K. Barsir

Appellee

Manor Care of Potomac MD, LLC

Trustee

Michael G. Wolff

Rockville, MD 20850

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Debtor Attorney

Diana Carolina Valle

10411 Motor City Drive, Ste 750

Bethesda, MD 20817

Appellee Attorney

William M Rudow

Attorney at Rudow Law Group LLC

5603 Newbury St

Baltimore, MD 21209

Trustee Attorney

Michael G Wolff

Attorney at Goren Wolff and Orenstein LLC

15245 Shady Grove Rd Ste 465 North Lobby

Rockville, MD 20850

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time re Appellant's brief and Appendix filed by Manor Care of Potomac MD, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rudow, William) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time re Appellant's brief and Appendix by Aletha K. Barsir (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valle, Diana) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Appeal by Manor Care of Potomac MD, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Rudow, William) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

6 #7

Text of Proposed Order

6 #4

Exhibit

6 #3

Exhibit

6 #6

Exhibit

6 #5

Exhibit

6 #2

Exhibit

6 #1

Memorandum in Support

#4

(#4) Bankruptcy Letter to Counsel regarding briefs. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

3 #6

Transmittal Sheet

3 #5

Docket Sheet

3 #4

BK #109 Order Sustaining Partial Objection to Exemption

3 #3

BK #103 Reply to Opposition to First Amended Partial Objection to Exemptio

3 #2

BK #89 Order Granting, In Part, and Denying, In Part, Debtor's Object

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time re Appellant's brief and Appendix filed by Manor Care of Potomac MD, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rudow, William) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Appeal by Manor Care of Potomac MD, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Rudow, William) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time re Appellant's brief and Appendix by Aletha K. Barsir (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valle, Diana) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Bankruptcy Letter to Counsel regarding briefs. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPELLEE'S DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal from U.S. Bankruptcy Court by Manor Care of Potomac MD, LLC re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal; (Attachments: #1 BK #88 Memorandum Opinion, #2 BK #89 Order Granting, In Part, and Denying, In Part, Debtor's Objection to Claim, #3 BK #103 Reply to Opposition to First Amended Partial Objection to Exemption, #4 BK #109 Order Sustaining Partial Objection to Exemption, #5 Docket Sheet, #6 Transmittal Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPELLANT'S DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal from U.S. Bankruptcy Court by Aletha K. Barsir re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal; Appellant Brief due by 1/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 BK #38 Objection to Claim Number 1, #2 BK #38-1 Memorandum in Support, #3 BK #38-2 Proposed Order, #4 BK #46 Opposition to Objection to Claim Number 1, #5 BK #46-1 Memorandum in Opposition, #6 BK #46-2 Exhibit 1, #7 BK #46-3 Exhibit 2, #8 BK #46-4 Exhibit 3, #9 BK #46-5 Exhibit 4, #10 BK #46-6 Exhibit 5, #11 BK #46-7 Exhibit 6, #12 BK #46-8 Exhibit 7, #13 BK #46-9 Exhibit 8, #14 BK #46-10 Exhibit 9, #15 BK #46-11 Proposed Order, #16 BK #99 First Amended Partial Objection to Exemption, #17 BK #99-1 Memorandum in Support, #18 BK #99-2 Exhibit 1, #19 BK #99-3 Exhibit 2, #20 BK #102 Opposition to First Amended Partial Objection to Exemption, #21 BK #102-1 Proposed Order, #22 Docket Sheet, #23 Transmittal Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. (Southern). Bankruptcy Court case number 19-15518, filed by Aletha K. Barsir. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Transmittal Sheet)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.