Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/20/2020 at 09:33:26 (UTC).

Barry Adams et al v. ZF Active Safety and Electronics US LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 Barry Adams filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against ZF Active Safety and Electronics US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Paul L. Abrams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-09668

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Paul L. Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tiffany Ecklor

James Dean

Burton Reckles

Gersen Damens

Carl Miller

Deloras McMurray

Paul Huitzil

Ravichandran Namakkal

James Kneup

Richard Kintzel

Lore VanHouten

Defendants

Honda R&D Americas, LLC

ZF Active Safety and Electronics US LLC

Hyundai Motor Co Ltd

Honda Motor Co Ltd

Mitsubishi Motors North America Inc

Kia Motors Corporation

ZF Automotive US Inc.

ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp

American Honda Motor Co Inc

40 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gretchen F. Cappio

Attorney at Keller Rohrback LLP

1201 Third Avenue Suite 3200

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Deloras McMurray, Gersen Damens, John Robinson, Danny Hunt, Larae Angel, Barry Adams, Richard Kintzel, Dan Sutterfield, Paul Huitzil, Donna Ronan, Burton Reckles, Remigiusz Rundzio, Steve Laveaux, Costanza Gonzalez, Michael Nearing, Dylan DeMoranville, Lore VanHouten, Tiffany Ecklor, Carl Miller, Ricky Gerischer, Ravichandran Namakkal, John Sancomb, Dorothy Cooks, Bobbi Jo Birk-LaBarge, James Dean, Tatiana Gales, Lawrence Graziano, Joy Davis, John Colbert, James Kneup, Brian Collins. upon Mitsubishi Motors North America Inc waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Douglas Robinson. (Cappio, Gretchen) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#20

(#20) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Deloras McMurray, Gersen Damens, John Robinson, Danny Hunt, Larae Angel, Barry Adams, Richard Kintzel, Dan Sutterfield, Paul Huitzil, Donna Ronan, Burton Reckles, Remigiusz Rundzio, Steve Laveaux, Costanza Gonzalez, Michael Nearing, Dylan DeMoranville, Lore VanHouten, Tiffany Ecklor, Carl Miller, Ricky Gerischer, Ravichandran Namakkal, John Sancomb, Dorothy Cooks, Bobbi Jo Birk-LaBarge, James Dean, Tatiana Gales, Lawrence Graziano, Joy Davis, John Colbert, James Kneup, Brian Collins. upon ZF Passive Safety Systems US Inc waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Tammy Tsoumas. (Cappio, Gretchen) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

#19

(#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Deloras McMurray, Gersen Damens, John Robinson, Danny Hunt, Larae Angel, Barry Adams, Richard Kintzel, Dan Sutterfield, Paul Huitzil, Donna Ronan, Burton Reckles, Remigiusz Rundzio, Steve Laveaux, Costanza Gonzalez, Michael Nearing, Dylan DeMoranville, Lore VanHouten, Tiffany Ecklor, Carl Miller, Ricky Gerischer, Ravichandran Namakkal, John Sancomb, Dorothy Cooks, Bobbi Jo Birk-LaBarge, James Dean, Tatiana Gales, Lawrence Graziano, Joy Davis, John Colbert, James Kneup, Brian Collins. upon FCA U.S., LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen D'Aunoy. (Cappio, Gretchen) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#18

(#18) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Deloras McMurray, Gersen Damens, John Robinson, Danny Hunt, Larae Angel, Barry Adams, Richard Kintzel, Dan Sutterfield, Paul Huitzil, Donna Ronan, Burton Reckles, Remigiusz Rundzio, Steve Laveaux, Costanza Gonzalez, Michael Nearing, Dylan DeMoranville, Lore VanHouten, Tiffany Ecklor, Carl Miller, Ricky Gerischer, Ravichandran Namakkal, John Sancomb, Dorothy Cooks, Bobbi Jo Birk-LaBarge, James Dean, Tatiana Gales, Lawrence Graziano, Joy Davis, John Colbert, James Kneup, Brian Collins. upon Hyundai Motor America Inc waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Matthew Tako. (Cappio, Gretchen) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#17

(#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Deloras McMurray, Gersen Damens, John Robinson, Danny Hunt, Larae Angel, Barry Adams, Richard Kintzel, Dan Sutterfield, Paul Huitzil, Donna Ronan, Burton Reckles, Remigiusz Rundzio, Steve Laveaux, Costanza Gonzalez, Michael Nearing, Dylan DeMoranville, Lore VanHouten, Tiffany Ecklor, Carl Miller, Ricky Gerischer, Ravichandran Namakkal, John Sancomb, Dorothy Cooks, Bobbi Jo Birk-LaBarge, James Dean, Tatiana Gales, Lawrence Graziano, Joy Davis, John Colbert, James Kneup, Brian Collins. upon KIA Motors America waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Matthew Tako. (Cappio, Gretchen) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#16

(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Deloras McMurray, Gersen Damens, John Robinson, Danny Hunt, Larae Angel, Barry Adams, Richard Kintzel, Dan Sutterfield, Paul Huitzil, Donna Ronan, Burton Reckles, Remigiusz Rundzio, Steve Laveaux, Costanza Gonzalez, Michael Nearing, Dylan DeMoranville, Lore VanHouten, Tiffany Ecklor, Carl Miller, Ricky Gerischer, Ravichandran Namakkal, John Sancomb, Dorothy Cooks, Bobbi Jo Birk-LaBarge, James Dean, Tatiana Gales, Lawrence Graziano, Joy Davis, John Colbert, James Kneup, Brian Collins. upon ZF Automotive US Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Tammy Tsoumas. (Cappio, Gretchen) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#15

(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Deloras McMurray, Gersen Damens, John Robinson, Danny Hunt, Larae Angel, Barry Adams, Richard Kintzel, Dan Sutterfield, Paul Huitzil, Donna Ronan, Burton Reckles, Remigiusz Rundzio, Steve Laveaux, Costanza Gonzalez, Michael Nearing, Dylan DeMoranville, Lore VanHouten, Tiffany Ecklor, Carl Miller, Ricky Gerischer, Ravichandran Namakkal, John Sancomb, Dorothy Cooks, Bobbi Jo Birk-LaBarge, James Dean, Tatiana Gales, Lawrence Graziano, Joy Davis, John Colbert, James Kneup, Brian Collins. upon ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Tammy Tsoumas. (Cappio, Gretchen) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#14

(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Deloras McMurray, Gersen Damens, John Robinson, Danny Hunt, Larae Angel, Barry Adams, Richard Kintzel, Dan Sutterfield, Paul Huitzil, Donna Ronan, Burton Reckles, Remigiusz Rundzio, Steve Laveaux, Costanza Gonzalez, Michael Nearing, Dylan DeMoranville, Lore VanHouten, Tiffany Ecklor, Carl Miller, Ricky Gerischer, Ravichandran Namakkal, John Sancomb, Dorothy Cooks, Bobbi Jo Birk-LaBarge, James Dean, Tatiana Gales, Lawrence Graziano, Joy Davis, John Colbert, James Kneup, Brian Collins. upon ZF North America Inc waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Tammy Tsoumas. (Cappio, Gretchen) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#13

(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Deloras McMurray, Gersen Damens, John Robinson, Danny Hunt, Larae Angel, Barry Adams, Richard Kintzel, Dan Sutterfield, Paul Huitzil, Donna Ronan, Burton Reckles, Remigiusz Rundzio, Steve Laveaux, Costanza Gonzalez, Michael Nearing, Dylan DeMoranville, Lore VanHouten, Tiffany Ecklor, Carl Miller, Ricky Gerischer, Ravichandran Namakkal, John Sancomb, Dorothy Cooks, Bobbi Jo Birk-LaBarge, James Dean, Tatiana Gales, Lawrence Graziano, Joy Davis, John Colbert, James Kneup, Brian Collins. upon ZF Active Safety and Electronics US LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Tammy Tsoumas. (Cappio, Gretchen) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

1 #17

Exhibit 17

1 #16

Exhibit 16

1 #15

Exhibit 15

1 #11

Exhibit 11

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT -- CLASS ACTION filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8085675 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Glacier County, Montana - County Where Action Arose: Out of State - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne County, Michigan. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court for the Central District of California, 2:19-ml-02905, Judge John A. Kronstadt] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19) (Cappio, Gretchen) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/29/2020.] (Entered: 10/02/2020)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Deloras McMurray, Gersen Damens, John Robinson, Danny Hunt, Larae Angel, Barry Adams, Richard Kintzel, Dan Sutterfield, Paul Huitzil, Donna Ronan, Burton Reckles, Remigiusz Rundzio, Steve Laveaux, Costanza Gonzalez, Michael Nearing, Dylan DeMoranville, Lore VanHouten, Tiffany Ecklor, Carl Miller, Ricky Gerischer, Ravichandran Namakkal, John Sancomb, Dorothy Cooks, Bobbi Jo Birk-LaBarge, James Dean, Tatiana Gales, Lawrence Graziano, Joy Davis, John Colbert, James Kneup, Brian Collins. upon Mitsubishi Motors North America Inc waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Douglas Robinson. (Cappio, Gretchen) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Deloras McMurray, Gersen Damens, John Robinson, Danny Hunt, Larae Angel, Barry Adams, Richard Kintzel, Dan Sutterfield, Paul Huitzil, Donna Ronan, Burton Reckles, Remigiusz Rundzio, Steve Laveaux, Costanza Gonzalez, Michael Nearing, Dylan DeMoranville, Lore VanHouten, Tiffany Ecklor, Carl Miller, Ricky Gerischer, Ravichandran Namakkal, John Sancomb, Dorothy Cooks, Bobbi Jo Birk-LaBarge, James Dean, Tatiana Gales, Lawrence Graziano, Joy Davis, John Colbert, James Kneup, Brian Collins. upon ZF Passive Safety Systems US Inc waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Tammy Tsoumas. (Cappio, Gretchen) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Deloras McMurray, Gersen Damens, John Robinson, Danny Hunt, Larae Angel, Barry Adams, Richard Kintzel, Dan Sutterfield, Paul Huitzil, Donna Ronan, Burton Reckles, Remigiusz Rundzio, Steve Laveaux, Costanza Gonzalez, Michael Nearing, Dylan DeMoranville, Lore VanHouten, Tiffany Ecklor, Carl Miller, Ricky Gerischer, Ravichandran Namakkal, John Sancomb, Dorothy Cooks, Bobbi Jo Birk-LaBarge, James Dean, Tatiana Gales, Lawrence Graziano, Joy Davis, John Colbert, James Kneup, Brian Collins. upon FCA U.S., LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen D'Aunoy. (Cappio, Gretchen) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Deloras McMurray, Gersen Damens, John Robinson, Danny Hunt, Larae Angel, Barry Adams, Richard Kintzel, Dan Sutterfield, Paul Huitzil, Donna Ronan, Burton Reckles, Remigiusz Rundzio, Steve Laveaux, Costanza Gonzalez, Michael Nearing, Dylan DeMoranville, Lore VanHouten, Tiffany Ecklor, Carl Miller, Ricky Gerischer, Ravichandran Namakkal, John Sancomb, Dorothy Cooks, Bobbi Jo Birk-LaBarge, James Dean, Tatiana Gales, Lawrence Graziano, Joy Davis, John Colbert, James Kneup, Brian Collins. upon Hyundai Motor America Inc waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Matthew Tako. (Cappio, Gretchen) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Deloras McMurray, Gersen Damens, John Robinson, Danny Hunt, Larae Angel, Barry Adams, Richard Kintzel, Dan Sutterfield, Paul Huitzil, Donna Ronan, Burton Reckles, Remigiusz Rundzio, Steve Laveaux, Costanza Gonzalez, Michael Nearing, Dylan DeMoranville, Lore VanHouten, Tiffany Ecklor, Carl Miller, Ricky Gerischer, Ravichandran Namakkal, John Sancomb, Dorothy Cooks, Bobbi Jo Birk-LaBarge, James Dean, Tatiana Gales, Lawrence Graziano, Joy Davis, John Colbert, James Kneup, Brian Collins. upon KIA Motors America waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Matthew Tako. (Cappio, Gretchen) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Deloras McMurray, Gersen Damens, John Robinson, Danny Hunt, Larae Angel, Barry Adams, Richard Kintzel, Dan Sutterfield, Paul Huitzil, Donna Ronan, Burton Reckles, Remigiusz Rundzio, Steve Laveaux, Costanza Gonzalez, Michael Nearing, Dylan DeMoranville, Lore VanHouten, Tiffany Ecklor, Carl Miller, Ricky Gerischer, Ravichandran Namakkal, John Sancomb, Dorothy Cooks, Bobbi Jo Birk-LaBarge, James Dean, Tatiana Gales, Lawrence Graziano, Joy Davis, John Colbert, James Kneup, Brian Collins. upon ZF Automotive US Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Tammy Tsoumas. (Cappio, Gretchen) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Deloras McMurray, Gersen Damens, John Robinson, Danny Hunt, Larae Angel, Barry Adams, Richard Kintzel, Dan Sutterfield, Paul Huitzil, Donna Ronan, Burton Reckles, Remigiusz Rundzio, Steve Laveaux, Costanza Gonzalez, Michael Nearing, Dylan DeMoranville, Lore VanHouten, Tiffany Ecklor, Carl Miller, Ricky Gerischer, Ravichandran Namakkal, John Sancomb, Dorothy Cooks, Bobbi Jo Birk-LaBarge, James Dean, Tatiana Gales, Lawrence Graziano, Joy Davis, John Colbert, James Kneup, Brian Collins. upon ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Tammy Tsoumas. (Cappio, Gretchen) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Deloras McMurray, Gersen Damens, John Robinson, Danny Hunt, Larae Angel, Barry Adams, Richard Kintzel, Dan Sutterfield, Paul Huitzil, Donna Ronan, Burton Reckles, Remigiusz Rundzio, Steve Laveaux, Costanza Gonzalez, Michael Nearing, Dylan DeMoranville, Lore VanHouten, Tiffany Ecklor, Carl Miller, Ricky Gerischer, Ravichandran Namakkal, John Sancomb, Dorothy Cooks, Bobbi Jo Birk-LaBarge, James Dean, Tatiana Gales, Lawrence Graziano, Joy Davis, John Colbert, James Kneup, Brian Collins. upon ZF North America Inc waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Tammy Tsoumas. (Cappio, Gretchen) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Deloras McMurray, Gersen Damens, John Robinson, Danny Hunt, Larae Angel, Barry Adams, Richard Kintzel, Dan Sutterfield, Paul Huitzil, Donna Ronan, Burton Reckles, Remigiusz Rundzio, Steve Laveaux, Costanza Gonzalez, Michael Nearing, Dylan DeMoranville, Lore VanHouten, Tiffany Ecklor, Carl Miller, Ricky Gerischer, Ravichandran Namakkal, John Sancomb, Dorothy Cooks, Bobbi Jo Birk-LaBarge, James Dean, Tatiana Gales, Lawrence Graziano, Joy Davis, John Colbert, James Kneup, Brian Collins. upon ZF Active Safety and Electronics US LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Tammy Tsoumas. (Cappio, Gretchen) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (esa) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-3) to Central District of California for MDL # 2905. (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/29/2020.] (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (esa) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 3 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 10/15/20 regarding transfer of Case No. 4:20-cv-12699 MFL EAS from Eastern District of Michigan. Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:19-ml-2905 JAK (FFMx). (esa) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-3) for MDL # 2905. [Informational Copy] (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/29/2020.] (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Honda of America Mfg., Inc. waiver sent on 10/7/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Cappio, Gretchen) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/29/2020.] (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Honda R&D Americas, LLC waiver sent on 10/7/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Cappio, Gretchen) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/29/2020.] (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. American Honda Motor Co., Inc. waiver sent on 10/7/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Cappio, Gretchen) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/29/2020.] (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/29/2020.] (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (NAhm) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/29/2020.] (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT -- CLASS ACTION filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8085675 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Glacier County, Montana - County Where Action Arose: Out of State - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne County, Michigan. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court for the Central District of California, 2:19-ml-02905, Judge John A. Kronstadt] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19) (Cappio, Gretchen) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/29/2020.] (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZF ACTIVE SAFETY AND ELECTRONICS US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Kia Motors Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where HONDA R&D AMERICAS, INC is a litigant