Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/10/2020 at 08:06:14 (UTC).

BARRS v. AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 BARRS filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is TILMAN E SELF, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00494

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TILMAN E SELF, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EARL D BARRS

Defendant

AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DUKE R GROOVER

Attorney at JAMES BATES

Po Box 4283

Macon, GA 31208-4283

BRUCE D DUBBERLY, IV

Attorney at COOPER DRAUGHON & COOPER LLP

170 College St

Macon, GA 31202

LAUREN N SCHULTZ

Attorney at James Bates Brannan Groover, LLP

231 Riverside Drive, P.O. Box 4283

Macon, GA 31208-4283

Defendant Attorneys

SYLVIA HOARD COBB

201 17Th St Ste 300

Atlanta, GA 30363

MICHAEL C KENDALL

3152 Golf Ridge Blvd, Ste 201

Douglasville, GA 30135

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery to be complete by 7/10/2020. Dispositive motions due by 8/8/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 1/15/2020. (chc) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY.(KENDALL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

6 #1

Required Form

#6

(#6) RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 1/13/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 12/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(chc) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by BRUCE D DUBBERLY, IV on behalf of EARL D BARRS Attorney BRUCE D DUBBERLY, IV added to party EARL D BARRS(pty:pla) (DUBBERLY, BRUCE) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#4

(#4) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (vs) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#3

(#3) Jurisdictional Statement by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (KENDALL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (KENDALL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Required Form Certificate

1 #4

Removal Documents Notice of Filing Removal

1 #3

Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Removal (Superior Court)

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Removal (Dist. Ct.)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Pleadings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL against EARL D BARRS Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3338653, $400 filed by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Removal (Dist. Ct.), #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Removal (Superior Court), #4 Removal Documents Notice of Filing Removal, #5 Required Form Certificate, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(KENDALL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery to be complete by 7/10/2020. Dispositive motions due by 8/8/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 1/15/2020. (chc) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY.(KENDALL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 1/13/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 12/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(chc) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by BRUCE D DUBBERLY, IV on behalf of EARL D BARRS Attorney BRUCE D DUBBERLY, IV added to party EARL D BARRS(pty:pla) (DUBBERLY, BRUCE) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (vs) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY ); Notice to Counsel - SYLVIA H. COBB - Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER. (vs) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Jurisdictional Statement by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (KENDALL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY (KENDALL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL against EARL D BARRS Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3338653, $400 filed by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Removal (Dist. Ct.), #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Removal (Superior Court), #4 Removal Documents Notice of Filing Removal, #5 Required Form Certificate, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(KENDALL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auto-Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael C Kendall