This case was last updated from PACER on 12/31/2019 at 08:29:02 (UTC).

Barrow v. Sellers et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 Barrow filed an Other lawsuit against Sellers. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00797

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adam I Barrow

Defendants

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Thomas M Sellers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jerry J Jarzombek

Attorney at Law Office of Jerry Jarzombek, PLLC

301 Commerce Street, Suite 2900

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Defendant Attorney

Clayton Lanier Falls

Attorney at K & L Gates LLP - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 2800

Dallas, TX 75201-7349

 

Court Documents

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E - Barrow's reply to Wells Fargo's response

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Thomas M Sellers. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D - Wells Fargo's response to motion for new trial

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Falls, Clayton) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..( Falls, Clayton) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Application for writ of garnishment

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit F - Order denying motion for new trial

#5

(#5) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Thomas M Sellers.( Falls, Clayton) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C - Barrow's motion for new trial

1 #8

Exhibit Exhibit H - Email with expenses of appeal

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7503103.), filed by Adam I Barrow, J.M.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Application for writ of garnishment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Agreed judgment of garnishment, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Barrow's motion for new trial, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Wells Fargo's response to motion for new trial, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Barrow's reply to Wells Fargo's response, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Order denying motion for new trial, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Memorandum Opinion from Fort Worth Court of Appeals, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Email with expenses of appeal)(Jarzombek, Jerry) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2019: #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (baf, ). (Entered: 11/01/2019)

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibit G - Memorandum Opinion from Fort Worth Court of Appeals

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Agreed judgment of garnishment

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to 1/10/2020; Thomas M Sellers to 1/10/2020. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, ) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Falls, Clayton) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Thomas M Sellers to 12/27/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, ) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Thomas M Sellers.( Falls, Clayton) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to 12/27/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..( Falls, Clayton) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Thomas M Sellers. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7503103.), filed by Adam I Barrow, J.M.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Application for writ of garnishment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Agreed judgment of garnishment, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Barrow's motion for new trial, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Wells Fargo's response to motion for new trial, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Barrow's reply to Wells Fargo's response, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Order denying motion for new trial, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Memorandum Opinion from Fort Worth Court of Appeals, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Email with expenses of appeal)(Jarzombek, Jerry) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2019: #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (baf, ). (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.