This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2020 at 08:57:31 (UTC).

Barrow v. Helicopter Parts International, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 Barrow filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Helicopter Parts International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Miranda M. Du and Carla Baldwin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00528

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Miranda M. Du

Referral Judge

Carla Baldwin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Erica Barrow

Defendants

Harry Niwranski

Helicopter Parts International, Inc.

Anthony Magnotta

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew C. Piccolo

Attorney at Piccolo Law Offices

8565 S. Eastern Ave., Ste. 150

Las Vegas, NV 89123

Sean Neahusan

Attorney at Sean Neahusan, Attorney at Law

300 South Arlington Ave, Suite B

Reno, NV 89501

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony L. Hall

Attorney at Simons Hall Johnston PC

6490 S. Mccarran Blvd., Ste. F-46

Reno, NV 89509

Jonathan A McGuire

Attorney at Simons Hall Johnston PC

6490 S. Mccarran Blvd., Ste. F-46

Reno, NV 89509

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER granting ECF No. #14 Stipulation. Plaintiff's response to the first Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #11 ) is due on or before November 19, 2020. Plaintiff's response to the second Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #12 ) is due on or before November 30, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#15

(#15) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Helicopter Parts International, Inc., Anthony Magnotta, Harry Niwranski. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hall, Anthony) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#14

(#14) First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Plaintiff to Respond to Motions to Dismiss re #11 Motion to Dismiss,, #12 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Erica Barrow. (Piccolo, Matthew) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: A video case management conference utilizing Zoom video conferencing technology is set for 12/21/2020 at 11:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. The court will send an email containing information required to join the Zoom video conference prior to the hearing date. If the party (or counsel) does not have access to a video or would like to appear by another means (i.e., telephonic), they are required to file a motion in advance of the hearing to appear by another means. The parties shall file a joint case management report by no later than Monday, December 14, 2020. See the attached order for specifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 11/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

12 #1

Exhibit 1

#12

(#12) Special MOTION to Dismiss #4 Amended Complaint Pursuant to NRS 41.660 by Defendants Helicopter Parts International, Inc., Anthony Magnotta, Harry Niwranski. Responses due by 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Hall, Anthony) Modified event on 11/4/2020 (LE). (Entered: 11/02/2020)

11 #2

Exhibit 2

11 #1

Exhibit 1

#11

(#11) MOTION to Dismiss #4 Amended Complaint by Defendants Helicopter Parts International, Inc., Anthony Magnotta, Harry Niwranski. Responses due by 11/12/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Hall, Anthony) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting ECF No. #9 Stipulation re ECF No. #4 Complaint. Answer/response due by 10/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 10/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#9

(#9) First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendants to Respond to Complaint re #4 Amended Complaint by Defendants Helicopter Parts International, Inc., Anthony Magnotta, Harry Niwranski. (McGuire, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

8 #2

Anthony Magnotta

8 #1

Harry Niwranski

#8

(#8) SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Harry Niwranski, #2 Anthony Magnotta) (LW) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Erica Barrow. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Piccolo, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#6

(#6) CIVIL COVER SHEET to #4 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Erica Barrow. (Piccolo, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#4

(#4) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Erica Barrow. No changes to parties. (Piccolo, Matthew) Modified event on 9/18/2020 (LE). (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Anthony Magnotta by Plaintiff Erica Barrow. (Piccolo, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting ECF No. #14 Stipulation. Plaintiff's response to the first Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #11 ) is due on or before November 19, 2020. Plaintiff's response to the second Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #12 ) is due on or before November 30, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Helicopter Parts International, Inc., Anthony Magnotta, Harry Niwranski. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hall, Anthony) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Plaintiff to Respond to Motions to Dismiss re #11 Motion to Dismiss,, #12 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Erica Barrow. (Piccolo, Matthew) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: A video case management conference utilizing Zoom video conferencing technology is set for 12/21/2020 at 11:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. The court will send an email containing information required to join the Zoom video conference prior to the hearing date. If the party (or counsel) does not have access to a video or would like to appear by another means (i.e., telephonic), they are required to file a motion in advance of the hearing to appear by another means. The parties shall file a joint case management report by no later than Monday, December 14, 2020. See the attached order for specifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 11/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Special MOTION to Dismiss #4 Amended Complaint Pursuant to NRS 41.660 by Defendants Helicopter Parts International, Inc., Anthony Magnotta, Harry Niwranski. Responses due by 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Hall, Anthony) Modified event on 11/4/2020 (LE). (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Dismiss #4 Amended Complaint by Defendants Helicopter Parts International, Inc., Anthony Magnotta, Harry Niwranski. Responses due by 11/12/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Hall, Anthony) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting ECF No. #9 Stipulation re ECF No. #4 Complaint. Answer/response due by 10/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 10/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendants to Respond to Complaint re #4 Amended Complaint by Defendants Helicopter Parts International, Inc., Anthony Magnotta, Harry Niwranski. (McGuire, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Harry Niwranski, #2 Anthony Magnotta) (LW) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Erica Barrow. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Piccolo, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL COVER SHEET to #4 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Erica Barrow. (Piccolo, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (LE) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Docket Correction to #4 Complaint : QC modified event from amended complaint to complaint. (no image attached) (LE) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Erica Barrow. No changes to parties. (Piccolo, Matthew) Modified event on 9/18/2020 (LE). (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Anthony Magnotta by Plaintiff Erica Barrow. (Piccolo, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Harry Niwranski by Plaintiff Erica Barrow. (Piccolo, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Helicopter Parts International, Inc. by Plaintiff Erica Barrow. (Piccolo, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less