Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/28/2019 at 07:53:55 (UTC).

Barroca v. Quintana

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 Barroca filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Quintana. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph M. Hood and P SO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00228

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph M. Hood

Referral Judge

P SO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Robert W. Barroca

Lexington, KY 40512

Respondent

Francisco Quintana

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER: 1. Barroca's #8 MOTION for Reconsideration is GRANTED. 2. The Clerk's Office shall RESTORE this matter to the Court's active docket. 3. Barroca's #1 Habeas Petition now stands submitted for initial screening. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 7/25/2019.(JJ)cc: COR, Ptnr via US Mail (Entered: 07/25/2019)

8 #1

Mailing Envelope - Post Marked 7/22/2019

#8

(#8) MOTION for Reconsideration re #4 Order by Robert W. Barroca, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope - Post Marked 7/22/2019)(JJ) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER: 1. This case remains closed. 2. If Barroca would like to file a new 2241 petition regarding this matter, he must file that petition with the United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/28/2019.(JJ)cc: Pro Se via US Mail (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#6

(#6) HABEAS CORPUS Filing fee received- $5, receipt number 5027851. Payment was made on behalf of Petitioner Barroca (SLH) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER: 1. Barroca's #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED without prejudice. 2. This action is STRICKEN from the Court's docket. 3. The Clerk shall send Barroca the following forms: a. E.D. Ky 521 Form; b. AO 240 Form; and c. E.D.Ky. 523 Form. 4. If Barroca still wishes to initiate a case with this Court, he is welcome to do so. However, Barroca must complete the E.D. Ky. 521 Form and file it with this Court. At the same time, Barroca must also complete and file both the AO 240 and E.D. Ky. 523 Forms or, alternatively, he must pay the $5.00 filing fee or submit a copy of a completed BP199 Form that he filed with prison officials. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/12/2019.(JJ)cc: Petitioner w/ Forms via US Mail (Entered: 06/12/2019)

1 #11

Cover Letter & Envelope postmarked 5/28/2019

1 #10

Exhibit I - Inmate Discipline Program pg 17-19

1 #9

Exhibit H - Inmate Discipline Program pg 19

1 #8

Exhibit G - Inmate Discipline Program pg 30-31

1 #7

Exhibit F - Administrative Remedy - Informal Resolution

1 #6

Exhibit E - 2nd Administrative Remedy

1 #5

Exhibit D - Administrative Detention Order

1 #4

Exhibit C -1st Discipline Hearing Report

1 #3

Exhibit B - Discipline Hearing Report - Jan 17

1 #2

Exhibit A - Incident Report

1 #1

Memorandum of Fact and Law

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Robert W. Barroca, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Fact and Law, #2 Exhibit A - Incident Report, #3 Exhibit B - Discipline Hearing Report - Jan 17, #4 Exhibit C -1st Discipline Hearing Report, #5 Exhibit D - Administrative Detention Order, #6 Exhibit E - 2nd Administrative Remedy, #7 Exhibit F - Administrative Remedy - Informal Resolution, #8 Exhibit G - Inmate Discipline Program pg 30-31, #9 Exhibit H - Inmate Discipline Program pg 19, #10 Exhibit I - Inmate Discipline Program pg 17-19, #11 Cover Letter & Envelope postmarked 5/28/2019)(KM) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: 1. Barroca's #8 MOTION for Reconsideration is GRANTED. 2. The Clerk's Office shall RESTORE this matter to the Court's active docket. 3. Barroca's #1 Habeas Petition now stands submitted for initial screening. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 7/25/2019.(JJ)cc: COR, Ptnr via US Mail (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: re #8 MOTION for Reconsideration re #4 Order by Robert W. Barroca (JJ) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Reconsideration re #4 Order by Robert W. Barroca, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope - Post Marked 7/22/2019)(JJ) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: 1. This case remains closed. 2. If Barroca would like to file a new 2241 petition regarding this matter, he must file that petition with the United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/28/2019.(JJ)cc: Pro Se via US Mail (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) HABEAS CORPUS Filing fee received- $5, receipt number 5027851. Payment was made on behalf of Petitioner Barroca (SLH) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Robert Barroca re #4 Order Dismissing Case. Clerk forwarded mail to new address. (JJ) Modified text on 6/24/2019 (JJ). (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: 1. Barroca's #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED without prejudice. 2. This action is STRICKEN from the Court's docket. 3. The Clerk shall send Barroca the following forms: a. E.D. Ky 521 Form; b. AO 240 Form; and c. E.D.Ky. 523 Form. 4. If Barroca still wishes to initiate a case with this Court, he is welcome to do so. However, Barroca must complete the E.D. Ky. 521 Form and file it with this Court. At the same time, Barroca must also complete and file both the AO 240 and E.D. Ky. 523 Forms or, alternatively, he must pay the $5.00 filing fee or submit a copy of a completed BP199 Form that he filed with prison officials. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/12/2019.(JJ)cc: Petitioner w/ Forms via US Mail (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - filing fee not received (KM) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(KM) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Conflict Check run. (KM) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Robert W. Barroca, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Fact and Law, #2 Exhibit A - Incident Report, #3 Exhibit B - Discipline Hearing Report - Jan 17, #4 Exhibit C -1st Discipline Hearing Report, #5 Exhibit D - Administrative Detention Order, #6 Exhibit E - 2nd Administrative Remedy, #7 Exhibit F - Administrative Remedy - Informal Resolution, #8 Exhibit G - Inmate Discipline Program pg 30-31, #9 Exhibit H - Inmate Discipline Program pg 19, #10 Exhibit I - Inmate Discipline Program pg 17-19, #11 Cover Letter & Envelope postmarked 5/28/2019)(KM) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less