This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/21/2020 at 09:16:11 (UTC).

Barritt v. Saul

Case Summary

On 02/21/2020 Barritt filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Fred Van Sickle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00074

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fred Van Sickle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kaylene Marie Barritt

Defendants

Commissioner of Social Security

Andrew M Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin S Kerr

Attorney at Schneider Kerr & Robichaux

626 Se Alder Street, Po Box 14490

Portland, OR 97293

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals a lack of information. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Case Management Deadline set for 3/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • Docket(#7) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. (ASV) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals a lack of information. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Case Management Deadline set for 3/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Attorney, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Judge Assignment. Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle assigned to case. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kaylene Marie Barritt. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2020 Without Oral Argument before Honorable Judge Unassigned. (Kerr, Kevin). Document sealed and motion termed as it was filed incorrectly. Modified on 2/24/2020 (PL, Case Administrator). (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security IFP Pending Filed by Kaylene Marie Barritt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons OGC, #3 Summons USAG, #4 Summons USAO)(Kerr, Kevin) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin S Kerr