This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/24/2022 at 08:04:59 (UTC).

Barrionuevo v. Principal Life Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2022 Barrionuevo filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Principal Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Raag Singhal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-60619

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raag Singhal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUIS O. BARRIONUEVO

Defendants

Principal Life Insurance Company

PRINCIPAL NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Principal Securities, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Anthony Osborne

Attorney at Osborne & Francis

433 Plaza Real, Suite 271

Boca Raton, FL 33432

J. Robert Bell, III

Attorney at Osborne , Associates Law Firm, P.A.

433 Plaza Real Suite 271

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Caroline K. Kwak

Attorney at Loeffler Law Group PC

1363 Shermer Road, Suite 320

Northbrook, IL 60062

Michael S. Loeffler

Attorney at Loeffler Law Group PC

1363 Shermer Road, Suite 320

Northbrook, IL 60062

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer Saltz Bullock

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

600 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1600

Miami, FL 33312

Charles Mark Garabedian, Jr.

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

600 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1600

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Principal National Life Insurance Company, Principal Securities, Inc.. (Garabedian, Charles) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#20

(#20) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Garabedian, Charles) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#19

(#19) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Principal Life Insurance Company, Principal National Life Insurance Company, Principal Securities, Inc., filed by Luis O. Barrionuevo.(Osborne, Joseph) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#18

(#18) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Principal Life Insurance Company, Principal National Life Insurance Company, Principal Securities, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Principal Financial Services, Inc., Corporate Parent Principal Financial Group, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Principal Real Estate Investors, LLC, Other Affiliate Principal Development Investors, LLC, Other Affiliate Principal Real Estate Holding Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Principal Reissuance Company of Delaware, Other Affiliate Principal Reissuance Company of Delaware II, Other Affiliate Principal Life Insurance Company of Iowa, Other Affiliate Principal Holding Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Principal Reissuance Company of Vermont for Principal Life Insurance Company; Corporate Parent Principal Financial Services, Inc., Corporate Parent Principal Financial Group, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Principal National Life Insurance Company, Principal Securities, Inc. (Bullock, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Jennifer Saltz Bullock (Bullock, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Mark Garabedian, Jr on behalf of Principal Life Insurance Company, Principal National Life Insurance Company, Principal Securities, Inc.. Attorney Charles Mark Garabedian, Jr added to party Principal Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Charles Mark Garabedian, Jr added to party Principal National Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Charles Mark Garabedian, Jr added to party Principal Securities, Inc.(pty:dft). (Garabedian, Charles) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#14

(#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Principal Life Insurance Company, Principal National Life Insurance Company, Principal Securities, Inc.. Attorney Jennifer Saltz Bullock added to party Principal Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Saltz Bullock added to party Principal National Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Saltz Bullock added to party Principal Securities, Inc.(pty:dft). (Bullock, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/16/2022)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Caroline K. Kwak. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15533158 by Luis O. Barrionuevo. Responses due by 4/19/2022 (Osborne, Joseph) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Luis O. Barrionuevo. Principal Life Insurance Company served on 3/29/2022, response/answer due 4/19/2022. (Osborne, Joseph) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Luis O. Barrionuevo. Principal Securities, Inc. served on 3/29/2022, response/answer due 4/19/2022. (Osborne, Joseph) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Luis O. Barrionuevo. Principal National Life Insurance Company served on 3/29/2022, response/answer due 4/19/2022. (Osborne, Joseph) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#4

(#4) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorneys Michael S. Loeffler and Caroline K. Kwak, mailing date March 28, 2022. (cw) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to PRINCIPAL NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, PRINCIPAL SECURITIES, INC, Principal Life Insurance Company. (cds) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

1 #4

Summon(s) PRINCIPAL SECURITIES

1 #3

Summon(s) PRINCIPAL NATIONAL

1 #2

Summon(s) PRINCIPAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Principal National Life Insurance Company, Principal Securities, Inc.. (Garabedian, Charles) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Garabedian, Charles) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Principal Life Insurance Company, Principal National Life Insurance Company, Principal Securities, Inc., filed by Luis O. Barrionuevo.(Osborne, Joseph) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Principal Life Insurance Company, Principal National Life Insurance Company, Principal Securities, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Principal Financial Services, Inc., Corporate Parent Principal Financial Group, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Principal Real Estate Investors, LLC, Other Affiliate Principal Development Investors, LLC, Other Affiliate Principal Real Estate Holding Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Principal Reissuance Company of Delaware, Other Affiliate Principal Reissuance Company of Delaware II, Other Affiliate Principal Life Insurance Company of Iowa, Other Affiliate Principal Holding Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Principal Reissuance Company of Vermont for Principal Life Insurance Company; Corporate Parent Principal Financial Services, Inc., Corporate Parent Principal Financial Group, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Principal National Life Insurance Company, Principal Securities, Inc. (Bullock, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Jennifer Saltz Bullock (Bullock, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Mark Garabedian, Jr on behalf of Principal Life Insurance Company, Principal National Life Insurance Company, Principal Securities, Inc.. Attorney Charles Mark Garabedian, Jr added to party Principal Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Charles Mark Garabedian, Jr added to party Principal National Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Charles Mark Garabedian, Jr added to party Principal Securities, Inc.(pty:dft). (Garabedian, Charles) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document All Defendants. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/18/2022. (pls) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Principal Life Insurance Company, Principal National Life Insurance Company, Principal Securities, Inc.. Attorney Jennifer Saltz Bullock added to party Principal Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Saltz Bullock added to party Principal National Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Saltz Bullock added to party Principal Securities, Inc.(pty:dft). (Bullock, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Caroline K. Kwak. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/6/2022. (pls) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Caroline K. Kwak. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15533158 by Luis O. Barrionuevo. Responses due by 4/19/2022 (Osborne, Joseph) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael S. Loeffler. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15527860 by Luis O. Barrionuevo. Responses due by 4/18/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Osborne, Joseph) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Luis O. Barrionuevo. Principal Life Insurance Company served on 3/29/2022, response/answer due 4/19/2022. (Osborne, Joseph) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Luis O. Barrionuevo. Principal Securities, Inc. served on 3/29/2022, response/answer due 4/19/2022. (Osborne, Joseph) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Luis O. Barrionuevo. Principal National Life Insurance Company served on 3/29/2022, response/answer due 4/19/2022. (Osborne, Joseph) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • Docket(#6) PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONSWithin SEVEN (7) DAYS of entry of an appearance, each party, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties shall not include Judge Singhal or the paired magistrate judges as interested parties unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/29/2022. (pls) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Exhibits to pleadings and motions shall be docketed in accordance with the Courts CM/ECF procedures, Rule 3L.(2): (2) Describing an Attachment to a Docket EntryA party filing an attachment to a document shall select one of the prescribed attachment categories from the drop-down menu (e.g., affidavit, transcript), provide an alphabetical or numerical designation (e.g., Exhibit A, Exhibit 1), and descriptively name each attachment (e.g., Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Boo Radley) in a manner that enables the Court to easily locate and distinguish attachments. (Emphasis added.) Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/29/2022. (pls) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorneys Michael S. Loeffler and Caroline K. Kwak, mailing date March 28, 2022. (cw) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to PRINCIPAL NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, PRINCIPAL SECURITIES, INC, Principal Life Insurance Company. (cds) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against PRINCIPAL NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, PRINCIPAL SECURITIES, INC, Principal Life Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15508281, filed by LUIS O. BARRIONUEVO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) PRINCIPAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, #3 Summon(s) PRINCIPAL NATIONAL, #4 Summon(s) PRINCIPAL SECURITIES)(Osborne, Joseph) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRINCIPAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY AN IOWA is a litigant

Latest cases where PRINCIPAL NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Saltz Bullock