This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/05/2020 at 08:22:04 (UTC).

Barrier1 Systems, Inc. v. RSA Protective Technologies, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/06/2020 Barrier1 Systems, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against RSA Protective Technologies, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00340

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barrier1 Systems, Inc.

Defendant

RSA Protective Technologies, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher H. Blaszkowski

Attorney at RatnerPrestia, P.C.

1007 Orange Street, Suite 205, P.O. Box 1596

Wilmington, DE 19801

Andrew John Koopman

Attorney at RatnerPrestia, P.C.

1007 Orange Street, Suite 205, P.O. Box 1596

Wilmington, DE 19801

John P. Higgins

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph V. Saphia

Jessica H. Zafonte

Marc Stephen Casarino

Attorney at White & Williams

600 North King Street, Suite 800

Wilmington, DE 19801-3722

 

Court Documents

19 #4

Exhibit C

19 #3

Exhibit B

19 #2

Exhibit A

19 #1

Second Declaration of Christopher Blaszkowski

#19

(#19) REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Barrier1 Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration of Christopher Blaszkowski, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Blaszkowski, Christopher) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

17 #1

Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order

#17

(#17) Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from RSA Protective Technologies regarding Submission of Joint Proposed Scheduling Order - re 13 Oral Order,,,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order)(Casarino, Marc) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

16 #1

Exhibit 1

#16

(#16) RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by RSA Protective Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Casarino, Marc) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#14

(#16) RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by RSA Protective Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Casarino, Marc) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#12

SO ORDERED re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John P. Higgins filed by Barrier1 Systems, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/13/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#5

(#5) Alias SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barrier1 Systems, Inc.. RSA Protective Technologies, LLC served on 3/11/2020, answer due 4/1/2020. (Blaszkowski, Christopher) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Barrier1 Systems, Inc. (nmg) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,215,865 B2. (nmg) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against RSA Protective Technologies, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2872436.) - filed by Barrier1 Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Barrier1 Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration of Christopher Blaszkowski, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Blaszkowski, Christopher) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maryellen Noreika - Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 4/29/2020. The cases are consolidated through discovery. The parties shall confer and resubmit a proposed scheduling order by the end of the day on 5/6/2020. (Court Reporter Dale Hawkins.) Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00340-MN, 1:20-cv-00341-MN(mdb) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Jessica H. Zafonte, and Joseph V. Saphia for RSA Protective Technologies, LLC, added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00341-MN, 1:20-cv-00340-MN(sam) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • Docket(#18) ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Rule 16 Telephone Conference is set for 4/29/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maryellen Noreika. Counsel shall provide a dial-in number for this teleconference by emailing this Court's judicial administrator no later than 5:00 p.m. on 4/27/2020. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/23/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from RSA Protective Technologies regarding Submission of Joint Proposed Scheduling Order - re 13 Oral Order,,,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order)(Casarino, Marc) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Reply Brief Deadline - re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/29/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by RSA Protective Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Casarino, Marc) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney John P. Higgins for Barrier1 Systems, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 14 has been deleted from the docket and re-filed with the proper event codes - Motion filed as one D.I. and opening brief filed as a separate D.I. (dlw) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John P. Higgins filed by Barrier1 Systems, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/13/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Alias SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barrier1 Systems, Inc.. RSA Protective Technologies, LLC served on 3/11/2020, answer due 4/1/2020. (Blaszkowski, Christopher) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketSummons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to RSA Protective Technologies, LLC. (apk) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketSummons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to RSA Protective Technologies, LLC. (sam) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketRemark: Summons Mailed to RatnerPrestia per Counsels Request. (apk) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to RSA Protective Technologies, LLC on 3/6/2020. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Barrier1 Systems, Inc. (nmg) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,215,865 B2. (nmg) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against RSA Protective Technologies, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2872436.) - filed by Barrier1 Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Barrier1 Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where RSA Protective Technologies, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph V. Saphia