Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/14/2021 at 11:12:16 (UTC).

Barrientes, Jr. v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 Barrientes, Jr filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Home Depot U S A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Fernando Rodriguez, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00052

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando Rodriguez, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Juan Barrientes, Jr.

Defendants

Home Depot U S A., Inc

Home Depot U.S.A., Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael J Cisneros

Attorney at The Cisneros Law Firm

312 Lindberg Ave

Mcallen, TX 78501

Arturo Cisneros

Attorney at The Cisneros Law Firm

312 Lindberg

Mcallen, TX 78501

Defendant Attorney

Robert A Ewert

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois

2100 Ross Avenue, Suite 2000

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Juan Barrientes, Jr., filed.(Cisneros, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/29/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 before Judge Fernando Rodriguez Jr(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 138th Judicial District Court of Cameron County, Texas, case number 2021-DCL-01373-B (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26286655) filed by Home Depot U S A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Ewert, Robert) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Juan Barrientes, Jr., filed.(Cisneros, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/29/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 before Judge Fernando Rodriguez Jr(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 138th Judicial District Court of Cameron County, Texas, case number 2021-DCL-01373-B (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26286655) filed by Home Depot U S A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Ewert, Robert) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Ewert