This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/09/2022 at 08:22:11 (UTC).

Barrett v. Original Lender, MERS et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 Barrett filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Original Lender, MERS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Ray, II and J. Clay Fuller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02321

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Ray, II

Referral Judge

J. Clay Fuller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wayne-Anthony Barrett

Acworth, GA 30102

Defendants

Original Lender, MERS

Servicer, M&T BANK

Investor Trust M&T Trust, Et Al

McCalla Raymeir Leibert Pierce, LLC

Housing Urban Development

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Rachel Ross Friedman

Attorney at Burr & Forman, LLP-ATL

Suite 1100, 171 17Th St., N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30363

William Oxford Tate

Attorney at McCalla Raymer Liebert Pierce LLC - Roswell

1544 Old Alabama Road

Roswell, GA 30076-2102

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) RESPONSE re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wayne-Anthony Barrett. (tas) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

#19

(#19) Certificate of Interested Persons by Wayne-Anthony Barrett. (tas) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

#17

(#17) ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to file his Certificate of Interested Persons no later than 8/5/2022. Plaintiff is advised that failure to follow the Court's orders may result in a recommendation to the district judge that the case be dismissed. The Clerk is directed to resubmit this matter to the undersigned upon expiration of the above date if Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 7/27/2022. (tas) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

#15

(#15) AFFIDAVIT of Bert Falls, Mortgage Fraud Examiner by Wayne-Anthony Barrett. (tas) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by McCalla Raymeir Leibert Pierce, LLC re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Joinder with (Tate, William) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Original Lender, MERS, Servicer, M&T BANK identifying Corporate Parent M&T Bank Corporation for Servicer, M&T BANK; Corporate Parent MERSCORP, Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent ICE Mortgage Services, LLC for Original Lender, MERS. (Friedman, Rachel) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

3 #4

Exhibit C - Assignment

3 #3

Exhibit B - Deed of Trust

3 #2

Exhibit A - Note

3 #1

Brief

3 #3

Main Document

#2

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Wayne-Anthony Barrett re #2 Notice to Pro Se Parties. (tas) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wayne-Anthony Barrett. (tas) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Certificate of Interested Persons by Wayne-Anthony Barrett. (tas) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Wayne-Anthony Barrett re #17 Order. (tas) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to file his Certificate of Interested Persons no later than 8/5/2022. Plaintiff is advised that failure to follow the Court's orders may result in a recommendation to the district judge that the case be dismissed. The Clerk is directed to resubmit this matter to the undersigned upon expiration of the above date if Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 7/27/2022. (tas) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE re #15 Affidavit filed by Original Lender, MERS, Servicer, M&T BANK. (Friedman, Rachel) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) AFFIDAVIT by Wayne-Anthony Barrett. (tas) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AFFIDAVIT of Bert Falls, Mortgage Fraud Examiner by Wayne-Anthony Barrett. (tas) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (tas) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Certificate of Interested Persons by McCalla Raymeir Leibert Pierce, LLC. (Tate, William) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Original Lender, MERS, Servicer, M&T BANK. (Friedman, Rachel) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE Of Filing Affidavit of Fact Writ of Quo Warranto by Wayne-Anthony Barrett (tas) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE Of Filing Affidavit of Fact Adverse Claim of Title and Reversion of Ancestral Estate by Wayne-Anthony Barrett (tas) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE Of Filing Affidavit of Fact Memorandum of Trust by Wayne-Anthony Barrett (tas) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(Minute entry) Doc. 5 Construed as MOTION for Joinder of the #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by McCalla Raymeir Leibert Pierce, LLC. (clk) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by McCalla Raymeir Leibert Pierce, LLC re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Joinder with (Tate, William) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Original Lender, MERS, Servicer, M&T BANK identifying Corporate Parent M&T Bank Corporation for Servicer, M&T BANK; Corporate Parent MERSCORP, Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent ICE Mortgage Services, LLC for Original Lender, MERS. (Friedman, Rachel) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Original Lender, MERS, Servicer, M&T BANK. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A - Note, #3 Exhibit B - Deed of Trust, #4 Exhibit C - Assignment)(Friedman, Rachel) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Wayne-Anthony Barrett re #2 Notice to Pro Se Parties. (tas) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE to Pro Se Parties. Plaintiff is ADVISED that he must comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (FED. R. CIV. P.), as well as the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia (LR NDGa.). A pro se plaintiff is REQUIRED to provide the Clerk with an original of any further pleadings or other papers filed with the Court after the complaint and is further REQUIRED to SERVE upon the defendant(s) or counsel for the defendant(s), by mail or by hand delivery under FED. R. CIV. P. 5, a copy of every additional pleading or other paper described in FED. R. CIV. P. 5. Plaintiff is also ADVISED that, under LR 7, NDGa., PLEADINGS ALLOWED; FORM OF MOTIONS, if the deadline for a response to a motion passes without a response being filed, the motion is deemed unopposed. Plaintiff is further REQUIRED to keep the Court advised of his current address at all times during the pendency of the lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 6/14/2022. (tas) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Original Lender, MERS, Servicer, M&T BANK. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11857654) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Housing and Urban Development is a litigant

Latest cases where McCalla, Raymer, Leibert, Pierce, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachel Ross Friedman