This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 10:00:08 (UTC).

Barrett v. Greenville Police Department et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 Barrett filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Greenville Police Department. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James C. Dever, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-HC-02102

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Dever, III

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Willie Barrett

Greenville, NC 27834

Respondents

Officer Lopresti

Officer Doe 3

Officer Nock

Greenville Police Department

Officer Doe 1

Officer Doe 2

Mark Holtzman

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Willie Barrett. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

7 #3

Envelope

7 #1

Document in Support

#7

(#7) CORRECTED PETITION (on the form) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Willie Barrett. (Attachments: #1 Document in Support, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#6

(#6) Notice of Change of Address filed by Willie Barrett. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

5 #2

Envelope

5 #1

Cover Letter

#5

(#5) MOTION to Appoint Counsel or Transfer to a Federal Detention Center filed by Willie Barrett. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

4 #1

Envelope

#3

(#3) ORDER of Deficiency. The petition is not on the forms prescribed for use by this court AND the filing fee of $5.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Response due by 4/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 4/4/2019. Copy of order and forms sent to petitioner via US Mail. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

#2

(#2) Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Willie Barrett at Pitt County Detention Center. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Cover Letter

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Willie Barrett. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Love, L.) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motions Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever, III regarding #5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and #8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Case also submitted for petition review. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by Willie Barrett. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Willie Barrett. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORRECTED PETITION (on the form) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Willie Barrett. (Attachments: #1 Document in Support, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Change of Address filed by Willie Barrett. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Appoint Counsel or Transfer to a Federal Detention Center filed by Willie Barrett. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter from Willie Barrett regarding his pending lawsuits and requesting a section 2241 form. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) Requested form sent to petitioner via US Mail. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER of Deficiency. The petition is not on the forms prescribed for use by this court AND the filing fee of $5.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Response due by 4/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 4/4/2019. Copy of order and forms sent to petitioner via US Mail. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Willie Barrett at Pitt County Detention Center. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Willie Barrett. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Love, L.) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less