This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/20/2022 at 03:57:16 (UTC).

Barrett v. Armadillo Holdings, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 Barrett filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Armadillo Holdings, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Erica P. Grosjean and Ana de Alba. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00882

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Erica P. Grosjean

Presiding Judge

Ana de Alba

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Porsche Barrett

Defendants

Armadillo Holdings, LLC a Nevada limited liability company Doing business as Texas Roadhouse

Texas Roadhouse Management Corp.

Texas Roadhouse, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eduardo Garcia

Jackland K. Hom

Jean-Claude Lapuyade

Julieann Alvarado

Shani Or Zakay

Defendant Attorneys

Justin Taylor Maes Curley

Jeffrey A. Nordlander

Blake J. Burgan, PHV

Kristine Anne Gordon, PHV

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Porsche Barrett. (Lapuyade, Jean-Claude) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

#23

(#23) REPLY by Porsche Barrett re #21 Opposition to Motion. (Lapuyade, Jean-Claude) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

21 #2

Declaration of Kevin O'Bold

21 #1

Declaration of Heather Belton

21 #21

Main Document

13 #3

Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Action to State Court

13 #2

Declaration of Jean-Claude Lapuyade

13 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

13 #13

Main Document

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Armadillo Holdings, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (Curley, Justin) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

5 #3

VDRP

5 #2

Consent Form

5 #1

Standing Order

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Armadillo Holdings, LLC. (Curley, Justin) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#3

(#20) RESPONSE by Armadillo Holdings, LLC to #16 Objections, #3 Request for Judicial Notice. (Nordlander, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Armadillo Holdings, LLC (Curley, Justin) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#1

(#6) CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Armadillo Holdings, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (Curley, Justin) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Porsche Barrett. (Lapuyade, Jean-Claude) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • Docket(#25) MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Ana de Alba on 8/31/2022: (Text Only Entry) This matter is set for hearing before District Judge de Alba. The parties are ordered to submit a joint status report, not to exceed five pages, within 10 court days, that addresses the following: What is the procedural history of the case? Is the motion presently before the court still at issue for the parties? Have the parties engaged in settlement negotiations whether formally or informally? If so, when? Would the parties benefit from a mandatory settlement conference before a Magistrate Judge? Would the parties benefit from a status conference with Judge de Alba? The parties are further advised that due to the judicial resource emergency and COVID pandemic, there are more than 130 motions currently under submission in Judge de Alba's recently re-assigned caseload. The Court understands the impact that such a backlog has on the parties and although the Court will continue working diligently to resolve all pending motions, it may still be months before the parties' pending motion is resolved. As such, in light of having the heaviest district court caseload in the nation, limited Court resources, and the need to prioritize criminal and older civil matters over more recently filed actions, this Court strongly encourages the parties to consent to conduct all further proceedings before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (Hernandez, M) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/30/2022: As a Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay All Proceedings, document #7 , has been noticed for 9/6/2022, and a Motion to Remand Action to State Court, document #13 , has been noticed for 9/20/2022, both before the assigned District Judge, the Court vacates the Scheduling Conference set for 9/22/2022 before Magistrate Judge Grosjean. Within ten days after the issuance of the ruling on said motions, should the matter go forward, the parties are directed to contact Courtroom Deputy Michelle Rooney (mrooney@caed.uscourts.gov) to secure a new scheduling conference date. (Text Only Entry)(Rooney, M) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REPLY by Porsche Barrett re #21 Opposition to Motion. (Lapuyade, Jean-Claude) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of *District Judge Ana de Alba* to the bench of the Eastern District of California, this action is reassigned from *District Judge Dale A. Drozd* to District Judge Ana de Alba for all further proceedings. (Apodaca, P) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) OPPOSITION by Armadillo Holdings, LLC to #13 Motion to Remand,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Heather Belton, #2 Declaration of Kevin O'Bold)(Nordlander, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE by Armadillo Holdings, LLC to #16 Objections, #3 Request for Judicial Notice. (Nordlander, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REPLY by Armadillo Holdings, LLC to RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Compel,. (Nordlander, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/8/2022: (Text Only Entry) The parties are advised that in light of the ongoing public health emergency posed by the coronavirus (COVID-19) pandemic, and given the long-standing lack of judicial resources in the Eastern District of California, all civil motions set for hearing before District Judge Dale A. Drozd will be decided on the papers. The parties should not contact Judge Drozd's chambers to inquire about whether a hearing on a pending motion will be held. If the court determines that a hearing is necessary, the court will issue an order to specially set the motion for hearing by telephone or video conference. The parties are further advised that the deadlines for filing opposition and reply briefs are governed by Local Rule 230, which was recently amended.(Hernandez, M) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) OPPOSITION by Porsche Barrett to #7 Motion to Compel,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Plaintiff Porsche Barrett)(Lapuyade, Jean-Claude) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2022
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/25/2022: (Text Only Entry) The parties are advised that in light of the ongoing public health emergency posed by the coronavirus (COVID-19) pandemic, and given the long-standing lack of judicial resources in the Eastern District of California, all civil motions set for hearing before District Judge Dale A. Drozd will be decided on the papers. The parties should not contact Judge Drozd's chambers to inquire about whether a hearing on a pending motion will be held. If the court determines that a hearing is necessary, the court will issue an order to specially set the motion for hearing by telephone or video conference. The parties are further advised that the deadlines for filing opposition and reply briefs are governed by Local Rule 230, which was recently amended.(Hernandez, M) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Armadillo Holdings, LLC for attorney Kristine A. Gordon to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10344190) (Curley, Justin) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Armadillo Holdings, LLC for attorney Blake J. Burgan to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10344181) (Curley, Justin) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to COMPEL Arbitration and Stay All Proceedings by Armadillo Holdings, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Blake Burgan, #3 Declaration of Don Estepp)(Curley, Justin) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Armadillo Holdings, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (Curley, Justin) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/22/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Lawrence, A) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Armadillo Holdings, LLC. (Curley, Justin) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Armadillo Holdings, LLC in re #1 Notice of Removal. (Curley, Justin) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Armadillo Holdings, LLC (Curley, Justin) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Stanislaus County Superior Court, case number CV-22-001986 by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10332216) (Curley, Justin) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less