This case was last updated from PACER on 08/09/2021 at 08:18:02 (UTC).

BARRETO v. SPRAGUE et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 BARRETO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SPRAGUE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Madeline Cox Arleo and Michael A. Hammer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-12404

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Madeline Cox Arleo

Referral Judge

Michael A. Hammer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTIAN BARRETO

Defendants

DAWN SPRAGUE

NABISCO HOLDINGS CORPORATION

JEFFREY POET

MONDELEZ INTERNATIONAL, INC.

MONDELEZ GLOBAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SARA JACOBS

Attorney at COWEN, JACOBS & ROTHMAN

60 Court Street, Suite 5

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Defendant Attorney

AMBER M. SPATARO

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON PC

One Newark Center, 8Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by MONDELEZ INTERNATIONAL, INC..(SPATARO, AMBER) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 9/10/2021 at 12:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 9/8/2021. The parties shall dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/15/2021. (jqb, ) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Application for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Mondelez Global LLC. The document #3 submitted by MONDELEZ INTERNATIONAL, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/1/2021. (JB, ) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DECLARATION of Jeffrey Poat re #1 Notice of Removal, by MONDELEZ INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (SPATARO, AMBER) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MONDELEZ INTERNATIONAL, INC. identifying MONDELEZ GLOBAL LLC as Corporate Parent.. (SPATARO, AMBER) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Mondelez Global LLC.. (SPATARO, AMBER) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by AMBER M. SPATARO on behalf of MONDELEZ INTERNATIONAL, INC. (SPATARO, AMBER) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MONDELEZ INTERNATIONAL, INC. from Superior Court of Bergen County, NJ, case number BER-L-002841-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12538300), filed by MONDELEZ INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amber Spataro, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(SPATARO, AMBER) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONDELEZ INTERNATIONAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mondelez Global LLC Group Benefits Plan. the is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amber M. Spataro