This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/22/2022 at 09:26:26 (UTC).

Barrentine v. Shaw et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 Barrentine filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Shaw. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph Dawson, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-02001

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph Dawson, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alisha F Barrentine

Defendants

Mark A Shaw

Hub Group Trucking Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Justin Joaquin Arenas

Attorney at Arenas Law Office

520 Folly Road, Suite P

Charleston, SC 29412

Defendant Attorneys

Mark Steven Barrow

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow

Po Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29211

Aaron Jameson Hayes

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow PA

1515 Lady Street, Po Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29201

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Hub Group Trucking Inc, Mark A Shaw. (lgib, ) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hub Group Trucking Inc, Mark A Shaw. (lgib, ) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#5

(#5) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER.Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/15/2022, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/29/2022, Rule 26 Report due by 7/29/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/19/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/19/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/19/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/19/2022, Discovery due by 12/19/2022, Motions due by 1/18/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 4/18/2023, Mediation Due by 12/19/2022. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 6/24/2022. (lgib, ) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#6

(#6) Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Alisha F Barrentine.(Arenas, Justin) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Supporting Documents

7 #2

Supporting Documents

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Exhibit Rule 26(f) Report Attachment

#9

(#9) AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER.Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/19/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/19/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/19/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/19/2023, Discovery due by 3/19/2023, Motions due by 4/18/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 7/18/2023, Mediation Due by 3/19/2023. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 7/29/2022. (lgib, ) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER.Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/19/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/19/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/19/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/19/2023, Discovery due by 3/19/2023, Motions due by 4/18/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 7/18/2023, Mediation Due by 3/19/2023. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 7/29/2022. (lgib, ) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Hub Group Trucking Inc, Mark A Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rule 26(f) Report Attachment)(Hayes, Aaron) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Horry County. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Supporting Documents)(Barrow, Mark) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Alisha F Barrentine.(Arenas, Justin) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER.Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/15/2022, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/29/2022, Rule 26 Report due by 7/29/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/19/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/19/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/19/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/19/2022, Discovery due by 12/19/2022, Motions due by 1/18/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 4/18/2023, Mediation Due by 12/19/2022. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 6/24/2022. (lgib, ) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hub Group Trucking Inc, Mark A Shaw. (lgib, ) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Hub Group Trucking Inc, Mark A Shaw. (lgib, ) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Horry County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2022-CP-26-03552 (filing fee $402 receipt number ASCDC-10557753), filed by Hub Group Trucking Inc, Mark A Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents) (lgib, ) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HUB Group Trucking, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Steven Barrow